Htt 2007 Limited was launched on 22 Jan 2007 and issued a number of 9429033661711. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 16 directors: Grant Alister Harris - an active director whose contract began on 13 Jul 2009,
Oliver Fenner Moorcroft - an active director whose contract began on 30 Jan 2013,
Leone Manawa Smith Farquhar - an active director whose contract began on 19 Nov 2019,
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - an active director whose contract began on 18 Jun 2024,
Michelle Patrice Carabine - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 May 2015 and was terminated on 07 Jun 2024.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 10 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 29 Brown Street, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical).
Up until 15 Mar 2019, Htt 2007 Limited had been using 29 Brown Street, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 12 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 12 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Brown Street Fiduciaries Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110. Htt 2007 Limited has been classified as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Previous addresses
Address: 29 Brown Street, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Feb 2019 to 15 Mar 2019
Address: 29 Brown Street, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Oct 2009 to 14 Feb 2019
Address: C/-young Read Woudberg Ltd, 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jan 2007 to 29 Oct 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 12
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 07 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 12 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Brown Street Fiduciaries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033211442 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tate, Alan Roderick |
R D 2 Tauranga |
22 Jan 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Harris, Ross Peter |
Tauranga |
22 Jan 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Foster, David John |
Whakamarama Tauranga |
22 Jan 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Grant Alister Harris - Director
Appointment date: 13 Jul 2009
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2016
Oliver Fenner Moorcroft - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jan 2013
Address: Papamoa, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jan 2020
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jan 2013
Leone Manawa Smith Farquhar - Director
Appointment date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2019
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jun 2024
Address: Burleigh Waters, Gold Coast, 4220 Australia
Address used since 18 Jun 2024
Michelle Patrice Carabine - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 May 2015
Termination date: 07 Jun 2024
Address: Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2015
Katrina Rose Hulsebosch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Oct 2010
Termination date: 31 Oct 2023
Address: Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2022
Address: Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2010
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 May 2021
Termination date: 06 Mar 2023
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 07 May 2021
Deeanah Rosa Winders - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 May 2017
Termination date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 17 May 2017
David John Foster - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2007
Termination date: 29 Aug 2018
Address: Rd6, Tauranga, 3176 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2016
Jessie Bethea Holtom - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Sep 2015
Termination date: 01 Mar 2017
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Sep 2015
Lesley Anne Monteiro - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2007
Termination date: 24 Apr 2015
Address: Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2013
Ross Peter Harris - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2007
Termination date: 02 Apr 2015
Address: Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2010
Michelle Paddison - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Jan 2015
Termination date: 26 Mar 2015
Address: Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2015
Betty Crane - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2007
Termination date: 30 Sep 2013
Address: Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Dec 2012
Alan Roderick Tate - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jan 2007
Termination date: 30 Nov 2012
Address: R D 2, Tauranga,
Address used since 22 Jan 2007
Hermanus Stephanus Bosman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Apr 2007
Termination date: 24 Aug 2010
Address: Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2010
Lc Independent Trustee Limited
29 Brown Street
Cnnw Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 5 Limited
29 Brown Street
Ht Appointers Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 6 Limited
29 Brown Street
Ht Elos Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2011 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2012 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2013 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 2 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 3 Limited
29 Brown Street
Lc Independent Trustee Limited
29 Brown Street