Htt 2013 Limited was registered on 29 Jan 2013 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030385375. This registered LTD company has been run by 14 directors: Oliver Fenner Moorcroft - an active director whose contract started on 29 Jan 2013,
Grant Alister Harris - an active director whose contract started on 29 Jan 2013,
Leone Manawa Smith Farquhar - an active director whose contract started on 19 Nov 2019,
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - an active director whose contract started on 18 Jun 2024,
Michelle Patrice Carabine - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 May 2015 and was terminated on 07 Jun 2024.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 28 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 29 Brown Street, Tauranga, 3110 (category: physical, registered).
Up to 13 Nov 2019, Htt 2013 Limited had been using 29 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 12 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 12 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Brown Street Fiduciaries Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110. Htt 2013 Limited has been classified as "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965).
Previous address
Address: 29 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jan 2013 to 13 Nov 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 12
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 12 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Brown Street Fiduciaries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033211442 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
29 Jan 2013 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Oliver Fenner Moorcroft - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Address: Papamoa, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jan 2020
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2013
Grant Alister Harris - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2016
Leone Manawa Smith Farquhar - Director
Appointment date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2019
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - Director
Appointment date: 18 Jun 2024
Address: Burleigh Waters, Gold Coast, 4220 Australia
Address used since 18 Jun 2024
Michelle Patrice Carabine - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 May 2015
Termination date: 07 Jun 2024
Address: Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 08 May 2015
Katrina Rose Hulsebosch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Termination date: 31 Oct 2023
Address: Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2022
Address: Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2013
Michelle Elyssa Igasan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 May 2021
Termination date: 06 Mar 2023
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 07 May 2021
Deeanah Rosa Winders - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 May 2017
Termination date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 17 May 2017
David John Foster - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Termination date: 29 Aug 2018
Address: R D 6, Tauranga, 3176 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2013
Jessie Bethea Holtom - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Sep 2015
Termination date: 01 Mar 2017
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Sep 2015
Lesley Anne Monteiro - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Termination date: 24 Apr 2015
Address: Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2013
Ross Peter Harris - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Termination date: 02 Apr 2015
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2013
Michelle Paddison - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Jan 2015
Termination date: 26 Mar 2015
Address: Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jan 2015
Betty Crane - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2013
Termination date: 30 Sep 2013
Address: Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Jan 2013
Lc Independent Trustee Limited
29 Brown Street
Cnnw Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 5 Limited
29 Brown Street
Ht Appointers Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 6 Limited
29 Brown Street
Ht Elos Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2010 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2011 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt 2012 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 2 Limited
29 Brown Street
Htt No 3 Limited
29 Brown Street
Lc Independent Trustee Limited
29 Brown Street