Super Tasty Limited, a registered company, was launched on 11 Aug 2017. 9429046293312 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Takeaway food retailing" (business classification H451260) is how the company has been classified. This company has been run by 3 directors: Junsheng Fan - an active director whose contract began on 11 Aug 2017,
Lei Ji - an active director whose contract began on 21 Mar 2023,
Lei Ji - an inactive director whose contract began on 11 Aug 2017 and was terminated on 05 Mar 2023.
Last updated on 10 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 12 Newtown Street, Bromley, Christchurch, 8062 (type: physical, service).
Super Tasty Limited had been using Flat 7, 868 Colombo Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their registered address up to 19 Mar 2018.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50%) held by 2 entities. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
12 Newtown Street, Bromley, Christchurch, 8062 New Zealand
Previous address
Address: Flat 7, 868 Colombo Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Aug 2017 to 19 Mar 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 25 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Ji, Lei |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2023 - |
Director | Ji, Lei |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
11 Aug 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Fan, Junsheng |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
11 Aug 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ji, Lei |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
11 Aug 2017 - 05 Mar 2023 |
Junsheng Fan - Director
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Mar 2023
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Mar 2023
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2018
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Lei Ji - Director
Appointment date: 21 Mar 2023
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Mar 2023
Lei Ji - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Termination date: 05 Mar 2023
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2018
Wood Plus Interiors Limited
Unit 5 16 Newtown Street
Maces Road Limited
14 Maces Road
Christchurch Caravans Limited
14 Maces Road
C.d.j. Enterprises Limited
183 Dyers Road
Reflex Holdings Limited
187 Dyers Road
The Composite Group Gp Limited
187 Dyers Road
Astig Filipino Food Express Limited
21 Claymore Street
H B & M W Enterprises Limited
C/o H Bowers & M Wilson
Jajah Limited
198a Estuary Road
Thai St Cuisine Limited
13 Wildwood Ave
Winmac Limited
101 Mcbratneys Road
Yum Yum Gyoza Limited
698a Avonside Drive