Fentec Group Limited, a registered company, was started on 08 Jun 2017. 9429046127389 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Landscaping supplies - wholesaling" (business classification F333930) is how the company was classified. The company has been managed by 5 directors: Jason Ben Mcgaveston - an active director whose contract began on 08 Jun 2017,
Timothy Charles Mcgaveston - an active director whose contract began on 08 Jun 2017,
Wilbert John Mcgaveston - an active director whose contract began on 08 Jun 2017,
Joseph Hilton Mcgaveston - an active director whose contract began on 08 Jun 2017,
Hubert James Mcgaveston - an active director whose contract began on 08 Jun 2017.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, namely: 60 Basstian Street, Prestonville, Invercargill, 9810 (registered address),
60 Basstian Street, Prestonville, Invercargill, 9810 (service address),
173 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 (physical address).
Fentec Group Limited had been using 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill as their registered address up until 24 Feb 2023.
Old names used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 11 May 2017 to 16 Jun 2017 they were named Cerca Nz Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 40100 shares) - Islington Group Limited - located at 9810, Prestonville, Invercargill.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 18 Aug 2020 to 24 Feb 2023
Address #2: 74 Basstian Street, Prestonville, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Jun 2017 to 18 Aug 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 40100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 22 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 40100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Islington Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051678364 |
Prestonville Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
04 Jan 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Mcgaveston, Timothy Charles |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Wilbert John |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Wilbert John |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Timothy Charles |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Timothy Charles |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Timothy Charles |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Lucy Elizabeth |
Rosedale Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Lucy Elizabeth |
Rosedale Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Lachlan Marshall |
Invercargill 9872 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2023 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Klara Joy |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Klara Joy |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Joseph Hilton |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Joseph Hilton |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Jason Ben |
Rosedale Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Jason Ben |
Rosedale Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Hubert James |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Director | Mcgaveston, Hubert James |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Deborah Hope |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Deborah Hope |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Deborah Hope |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Charlotte Louise |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Charlotte Louise |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Charlotte Emma |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Individual | Mcgaveston, Charlotte Emma |
Richmond Invercargill 9810 New Zealand |
08 Jun 2017 - 04 Jan 2024 |
Jason Ben Mcgaveston - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2017
Address: Rosedale, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jun 2017
Timothy Charles Mcgaveston - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2017
Address: Waihopai, Invercargill, 9872 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Address: Richmond, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Wilbert John Mcgaveston - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2017
Address: Karaka, Papakura, 2113 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Address: Richmond, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Joseph Hilton Mcgaveston - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2017
Address: Gladstone, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Address: Windsor, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Hubert James Mcgaveston - Director
Appointment date: 08 Jun 2017
Address: Waihopai, Invercargill, 9872 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Address: Richmond, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2017
Southern Lumber Company Limited
74 Basstian Street
Terranota Limited
74 Basstian Street
Auto Panels Waikiwi Limited
31 Basstian Street
Pooles Timber Limited
21 Benmore Street
Southern Probuilt Engines Limited
24 Basstian Street
Bike Stuff Limited
17 Howorth Street
Big Picture Holdings Limited
156b Aranui Road
Branchy's Landscape Supplies Limited
273 Arapaepae Road
Coastal Traders Limited
14 Greenaway Rd
Nz Landscape Supplies Limited
156b Aranui Road
Tight Traders Limited
63 Miro Street
Westland Stone And Minerals Limited
114 Ohoka Road