Sparrow Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 02 May 2017. 9429046103796 is the number it was issued. "Wooden furniture mfg" (business classification C251170) is how the company was classified. This company has been managed by 5 directors: David Sun - an active director whose contract began on 22 Nov 2017,
David Wei Sun - an active director whose contract began on 30 Sep 2019,
Jiuying Qian - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 Nov 2017 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2019,
Rahul Ghimiray - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 May 2017 and was terminated on 21 Feb 2018,
Rahul Ghimiray - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 May 2017 and was terminated on 21 Feb 2018.
Last updated on 16 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 58788, Botany, Auckland, 2163 (types include: postal, office).
Sparrow Limited had been using 51B Allens Road, East Tamaki, Auckland as their registered address up until 02 Nov 2018.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 10000 shares) - Xu Family Trustee Ltd - located at 2163, East Tamaki, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
19 Morgan Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 51b Allens Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 May 2017 to 02 Nov 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 05 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Other (Other) | Xu Family Trustee Ltd |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
02 May 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Qiu, Steven |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
26 Aug 2019 - 31 Mar 2022 |
Individual | Ghimiray, Rahul |
Papatoetoe Auckland 2025 New Zealand |
02 May 2017 - 26 Aug 2019 |
David Sun - Director
Appointment date: 22 Nov 2017
Address: Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Aug 2019
Address: Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2019
David Wei Sun - Director
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2019
Address: Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2019
Jiuying Qian - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Nov 2017
Termination date: 30 Sep 2019
Address: Waitoki, 0871 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2019
Address: Rd 1, Waitoki, 0871 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Nov 2017
Address: Waitoki, 0871 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jan 2019
Rahul Ghimiray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 May 2017
Termination date: 21 Feb 2018
Address: Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2017
Rahul Ghimiray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 May 2017
Termination date: 21 Feb 2018
Address: Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2017
Ministry Of Print Limited
51d Allens Road
Guy & Karen 2016 Nz Limited
55 Allens Road
Leaping Fish Limited
1/43 Allens Road
P. Burch Limited
2/43 Allens Road
Longly Limited
3/59 Allens Road
Buen Bioceuticals (nz) Limited
8 Blackburn Road
Amberley Manufacturing Limited
92 Kerwyn Avenue
Interiors By Innovation Limited
14e Echelon Place
Mike Gutry Limited
10 Pixie Place
Pacific Furnishings Limited
99b Nelson Street
Steale Holdings Limited
31 Lastel Place
Wardrobes And More Limited
C/-walthall & Associates Limited