Srhb 2017 Trustee Company Limited was launched on 20 Mar 2017 and issued an NZ business number of 9429046008336. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 8 directors: Libby Ellen O'sullivan - an active director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2017,
Sharlene Maree Bryant - an active director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2017,
Philip Bernard William Pinckney - an active director whose contract started on 20 Mar 2017,
Bevan Philip Condin - an active director whose contract started on 01 Feb 2020,
Michelle Angela Valler - an active director whose contract started on 01 Feb 2020.
As stated in BizDb's database (last updated on 22 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 (category: physical, registered).
Up to 24 Apr 2019, Srhb 2017 Trustee Company Limited had been using 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Bthb Trustee Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Hastings postcode 4122. Srhb 2017 Trustee Company Limited is categorised as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Previous address
Address: 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Mar 2017 to 24 Apr 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 06 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bthb Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049009248 |
Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
25 May 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Baker Tilly Staples Rodway Hawkes Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035570233 Company Number: 1477519 |
20 Mar 2017 - 25 May 2021 | |
Entity | Baker Tilly Staples Rodway Hawkes Bay Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035570233 Company Number: 1477519 |
Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2017 - 25 May 2021 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Libby Ellen O'sullivan - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2017
Address: Rd 12, Havelock North, 4294 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Sharlene Maree Bryant - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2017
Address: Rd 4, Napier, 4184 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Philip Bernard William Pinckney - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2017
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Bevan Philip Condin - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2020
Address: Jervoistown, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2021
Address: Taradale, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2020
Michelle Angela Valler - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2020
Address: Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2020
Kelly Erica Nunan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2023
Address: Greenmeadows, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2023
William David Sawers - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2017
Termination date: 31 Jan 2023
Address: Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Stuart Geoffrey Signal - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2017
Termination date: 31 Jan 2022
Address: Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2017
Rtl Consulting Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Bruce Trustee Company Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Bay Rheumatology Limited
205 Hastings Street
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 4) Limited
205 Hastings Street South
W & D Woodward Family Trustee Company Limited
205 Hastings Street
Jrmd Trustees (bg) Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 2) Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 3) Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Bramwell Grossman Trustees (pat And Ian) Limited
205 Hastings Street
Srhb 2012 Trustee Company Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Srhb 2014 Trustee Company Limited
205 Hastings Street South
Srhb 2015 Trustee Company Limited
205 Hastings Street South