Delta Velorum Limited was incorporated on 10 Feb 2017 and issued a number of 9429045951343. The registered LTD company has been managed by 5 directors: Matthew Terence Casey - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jan 2024,
David Roper - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Sep 2021 and was terminated on 31 Jan 2024,
Clifford Vaughn Bailey - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Feb 2017 and was terminated on 02 Sep 2021,
Carey George Tasker - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Feb 2017 and was terminated on 03 Sep 2018,
David Roper - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Feb 2017 and was terminated on 11 Feb 2017.
According to our database (last updated on 13 Sep 2024), the company uses 1 address: 235 Point Wells Road, Rd 6, Point Wells, 0986 (category: registered, service).
Up until 15 Sep 2021, Delta Velorum Limited had been using Flat 29 Brookvale Village, 17 Redwood Close, Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Casey, Matthew Terence (a director) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1021. Delta Velorum Limited was classified as "Plant and equipment hiring or leasing without operator (excluding office machinery or equipment)" (business classification L663947).
Principal place of activity
Flat 29 Brookvale Village, 17 Redwood Close, Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 29 Brookvale Village, 17 Redwood Close, Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jul 2019 to 15 Sep 2021
Address #2: Level 3 Vulcan Building, 118 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Jul 2019 to 11 Jul 2019
Address #3: 51 Symonds St, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Jul 2018 to 02 Jul 2019
Address #4: 29/17 Redwood Close, Paraparumu, Wellington, 5032 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Feb 2017 to 17 Jul 2018
Address #5: 29/17 Redwood Close, Paraparumu, Wellington, 5032 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Feb 2017 to 21 Feb 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 01 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Casey, Matthew Terence |
Ponsonby Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
23 Feb 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Roper, David |
Paraparaumu Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2021 - 23 Feb 2024 |
Individual | Bailey, Clifford Vaughn |
Paraparaumu Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2017 - 07 Sep 2021 |
Director | David Roper |
Paraparaumu Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2017 - 26 Jun 2017 |
Individual | Tasker, Carey George |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2017 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Roper, David |
Paraparaumu Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2017 - 26 Jun 2017 |
Matthew Terence Casey - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jan 2024
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2024
David Roper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2021
Termination date: 31 Jan 2024
Address: Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2021
Clifford Vaughn Bailey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Feb 2017
Termination date: 02 Sep 2021
Address: Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2019
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Feb 2017
Carey George Tasker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Feb 2017
Termination date: 03 Sep 2018
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Feb 2017
David Roper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Feb 2017
Termination date: 11 Feb 2017
Address: Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Feb 2017
Selacy.v Autoparts Supplier Limited
7 Redwood Close
Letmor Construction Limited
9b Vera Lane
Barrett Engineering Limited
11 Kaitawa Crescent
Transport Management Systems Limited
11 Kaitawa Crescent
Sentrycorp Limited
11 Kaitawa Crescent
Temporary Fencing Services Limited
1 Kaitawa Crescent
Asl Asset Holdings Limited
Level 1
Greater Mobility Limited
C/- J W Tanner
Kapiti Fencing & Gate Services Limited
1 Kaitawa Crescent
Renegade Productions Limited
23 The Esplanade
Temporary Fencing Services Limited
1 Kaitawa Crescent
Warkworth Hire Centre (1992) Limited
NZ Limited Company