Nodd2 Limited was launched on 17 Jan 2017 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429045911354. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Barry Cornelius - an active director whose contract started on 17 Jan 2017,
Diane Cornelius - an active director whose contract started on 17 Jan 2017.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 28 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 663 Whitford Road, Howick Rd1, Auckland, 2571 (category: postal, office).
Up until 14 Mar 2019, Nodd2 Limited had been using Level 2, 347 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Cornelius, Barry (a director) located at Rd 1, Howick postcode 2571.
The 2nd group consists of 2 shareholders, holds 98% shares (exactly 98 shares) and includes
Cornelius, Barry - located at Rd 1, Howick,
Cornelius, Diane - located at Rd 1, Howick.
The 3rd share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cornelius, Diane, located at Rd 1, Howick (a director). Nodd2 Limited was classified as "Child care service" (ANZSIC Q871010).
Principal place of activity
663 Whitford Road, Howick Rd1, Auckland, 2571 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 2, 347 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Sep 2018 to 14 Mar 2019
Address #2: 642 Great South Road, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Jan 2017 to 06 Sep 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Cornelius, Barry |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Director | Cornelius, Barry |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2017 - |
Director | Cornelius, Diane |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Cornelius, Diane |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
17 Jan 2017 - |
Barry Cornelius - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jan 2017
Address: Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jan 2017
Diane Cornelius - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jan 2017
Address: Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jan 2017
Birdwood Residential Estates Limited
642 Great South Road
Outback Surf (2013) Limited
642 Great South Road
Rugby Exchange New Zealand Limited
642 Great South Rd
Aozora Trustees Limited
642 Great South Road
Spare Room Solutions Limited
642 Great South Road
Ggc Holdings Limited
642 Great South Road
Miniwhais Limited
Unit 9, 22a Kalmia Street
Mwa Limited
19 Konini Road
Pink Beluga Asset Management Limited
Unit 9, 22a Kalmia Street
The Childrens Corner - Papatoetoe Limited
642 Great South Road
Treetops Early Learning Centre Botany Junction Limited
Unit 9, 22a Kalmia Street
Willowbank Kids Limited
642 Great South Road