Tahoraiti Trustees Limited was started on 16 Jan 2017 and issued an NZBN of 9429045892721. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: John David Heald - an active director whose contract started on 16 Jan 2017,
Rosamund Freia Allison Mcdonald - an active director whose contract started on 06 May 2019,
Richard Alexander Knight - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Jan 2017 and was terminated on 30 Jun 2020,
Nicola Mary Roberts - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Jan 2017 and was terminated on 07 May 2019.
As stated in our information (updated on 14 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 502 Main Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 (type: physical, registered).
Until 02 Nov 2018, Tahoraiti Trustees Limited had been using 484 Main Street, Palmerston North as their registered address.
A total of 30 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 30 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mcdonald, Rosamund Freia Allison (a director) located at Heathcote Valley, Christchurch postcode 8022.
Previous address
Address: 484 Main Street, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jan 2017 to 02 Nov 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 30
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 12 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Director | Mcdonald, Rosamund Freia Allison |
Heathcote Valley Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
10 May 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Knight, David Bower |
Westmere Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
06 May 2022 - 19 Jul 2023 |
Individual | Knight, Christopher David |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
16 Jan 2017 - 06 May 2022 |
Individual | Knight, Christopher David |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
16 Jan 2017 - 06 May 2022 |
Individual | Knight, David Bower |
Grafton Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
16 Jan 2017 - 10 May 2019 |
Individual | Rope, Victoria Emma |
Taradale Napier 4112 New Zealand |
16 Jan 2017 - 10 May 2019 |
John David Heald - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jan 2017
Address: Dannevirke, Dannevirke, 4930 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jan 2017
Rosamund Freia Allison Mcdonald - Director
Appointment date: 06 May 2019
Address: Heathcote Valley, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2019
Richard Alexander Knight - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jan 2017
Termination date: 30 Jun 2020
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jan 2017
Nicola Mary Roberts - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jan 2017
Termination date: 07 May 2019
Address: Dannevirke, Dannevirke, 4930 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jan 2017
Maintain-it-rentals Limited
484 Main Street
Rugged Outdoor Solutions Limited
484 Main St
Beechgrove Limited
484 Main Street
A.j. Rennie Limited
484 Main Street
Powerex Limited
484 Main St
Mandeno Consulting Limited
484 Main Street