Clean Homes Limited was started on 02 Dec 2016 and issued a number of 9429045859069. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Xiang Gao - an active director whose contract started on 19 Jul 2018,
Soledad Del Pilar Saez Gonzalez - an inactive director whose contract started on 19 Dec 2017 and was terminated on 19 Jul 2018,
Ann-Marie Whale - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 20 Dec 2017.
According to our database (updated on 06 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 48 Hope Farm Avenue, Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 (type: registered, physical).
Up until 27 Jul 2018, Clean Homes Limited had been using 10 Huntington Drive, Huntington Park, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gao, Xiang (an individual) located at Pakuranga Heights, Auckland postcode 2010. Clean Homes Limited has been classified as "Cleaning service" (ANZSIC N731110).
Previous addresses
Address: 10 Huntington Drive, Huntington Park, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Jan 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
Address: 2/11 Dinglebank Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Dec 2016 to 05 Jan 2018
Address: Unit 2, 11 Dinglebank Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Dec 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Gao, Xiang |
Pakuranga Heights Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Whale, Ann-marie |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
02 Dec 2016 - 19 Dec 2017 |
Individual | Whale, Layton Douglas |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
02 Dec 2016 - 19 Dec 2017 |
Director | Ann-marie Whale |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
02 Dec 2016 - 19 Dec 2017 |
Individual | Saez Gonzalez, Soledad Del Pilar |
Huntington Park Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
19 Dec 2017 - 19 Jul 2018 |
Xiang Gao - Director
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2018
Address: Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2018
Soledad Del Pilar Saez Gonzalez - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Dec 2017
Termination date: 19 Jul 2018
Address: Huntington Park, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Dec 2017
Ann-marie Whale - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2016
Termination date: 20 Dec 2017
Address: Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Dec 2016
Hhp Limited
3 Huntington Drive
Tse & Hui Limited
7 Huntington Drive
Pauanui Views Limited
Unit D, Level 1, 12 Amera Place
Origin Coffee Traders Nz Limited
Level 1, Unit D, 12 Amera Place,
Nz Yoyo Travelling Limited
158 Guys Road
Pc Fix It 2001 Limited
15 Millington Place
Bole International Limited
Flat 4, 28 Oneroa Road
Chnso Company Limited
Flat 5, 32 Opito Way
Goldmor Limited
50/2 Armoy Drive
Kg Electrical Limited
18 Nagle Place
Spotless New Zealand Limited
Suite 50, 2 Armoy Drive
Zeta Cleaning Limited
Suite 52, 2 Armoy Drive