Torbay Business Association Incorporated, a registered company, was launched on 05 Sep 2007. 9429043138159 is the business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Stephen Piner - an active officer whose contract started on 01 Oct 2022,
Ross Ironmonger - an active officer whose contract started on 31 Oct 2023,
Frances O'brien - an inactive officer whose contract started on 10 Jan 2022 and was terminated on 05 Sep 2023,
Marewa Glover - an inactive officer whose contract started on 08 Dec 2021 and was terminated on 01 Nov 2022.
Updated on 31 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 4 addresses this company uses, specifically: 61 Fitzwilliam Drive, Torbay, Auckland 0630 (postal address),
P O Box 89101, Torbay 0742, Auckland (postal address),
Tony Carter, Barfoot & Thompson, 1054B Beach Road, Torbay, Auckland (postal address),
8 Toroa Street, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 (registered address) among others.
Torbay Business Association Incorporated had been using 160 Stredwick Drive, Torbay, Auckland as their registered address until 05 Sep 2023.
Other active addresses
Previous addresses
Address #1: 160 Stredwick Drive, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Jan 2022 to 05 Sep 2023
Address #2: 61 Fitzwilliam Drive, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Aug 2014 to 10 Jan 2022
Stephen Piner - officer
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2022
Ross Ironmonger - officer
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2023
Frances O'brien - officer
Appointment date: 10 Jan 2022
Termination date: 05 Sep 2023
Marewa Glover - officer
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2021
Termination date: 01 Nov 2022
Ksk Group Nz T/a Looksmart Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive
Looksmart Alterations Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive
E'lan Associates Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive
G Sergent Enterprises Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive
C Chung Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive
Rolando Limited
57 Fitzwilliam Drive