Oogah Rodders Incorporated, a registered company, was incorporated on 27 Oct 2000. 9429043067794 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Richelle Edwards - an active officer whose contract began on 01 Jul 2021,
Mary Leanne Croft-Briggs - an active officer whose contract began on 05 Jul 2023,
Sydney James Alfred Briggs - an active officer whose contract began on 27 Oct 2023,
Steven Mark Smith - an active officer whose contract began on 27 Oct 2023.
Last updated on 07 Jan 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company uses, namely: 13 Arawa Street, New Lynn, Auckland (postal address),
13 Arawa Street, New Lynn, Auckland 0600 (registered address),
41 Nixon Road, Rd 2, Taupaki, 0782 (registered address).
Oogah Rodders Incorporated had been using 20 Andrew Baxter Drive, Mangere, Auckland as their registered address up until 01 Jul 2021.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 20 Andrew Baxter Drive, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Jun 2021 to 01 Jul 2021
Address #2: 13 Arawa St, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Aug 2019 to 02 Jun 2021
Richelle Edwards - officer
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2021
Mary Leanne Croft-briggs - officer
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2023
Sydney James Alfred Briggs - officer
Appointment date: 27 Oct 2023
Steven Mark Smith - officer
Appointment date: 27 Oct 2023
Palm Court Motel Limited
3162 Great North Road
Dawn2dusk Deliveries Limited
2/21 Arawa Street
Grace Chan Company Limited
23/2 Arawa Street
Ayemi Limited
16a Arawa Street
M & M Value Systems Limited
16a Arawa Street
Konik And Wells-green Limited
3139 Great North Road