Mcleans Island Caravan Camping Club Incorporated, a registered company, was started on 19 Jun 1978. 9429042747161 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 11 directors: Philip Lewis Robinson - an active officer whose contract started on 20 Jan 2020,
Grant Rae - an active officer whose contract started on 20 Jan 2020,
Justine Case - an active officer whose contract started on 21 Aug 2022,
Paul Case - an active officer whose contract started on 02 Mar 2024,
Kevin Murray Hobson - an inactive officer whose contract started on 19 Nov 2022 and was terminated on 02 Mar 2024.
Updated on 08 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, specifically: Po Box 13110, Armagh, Christchurch 8141 (postal address),
Level 1, 1 Papanui Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (registered address).
Mcleans Island Caravan Camping Club Incorporated had been using 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address up to 25 Aug 2023.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Sep 2022 to 25 Aug 2023
Address #2: 4 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Jan 2020 to 06 Sep 2022
Address #3: 71 Rhona Street, Linwood, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Jan 2005 to 20 Jan 2020
Philip Lewis Robinson - officer
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2020
Grant Rae - officer
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2020
Justine Case - officer
Appointment date: 21 Aug 2022
Paul Case - officer
Appointment date: 02 Mar 2024
Kevin Murray Hobson - officer
Appointment date: 19 Nov 2022
Termination date: 02 Mar 2024
Peter Mcconnell - officer
Appointment date: 21 Aug 2022
Termination date: 13 Mar 2023
Murray Kenneth Roxburgh - officer
Appointment date: 23 Aug 2020
Termination date: 06 Sep 2022
Sue Armstrong - officer
Appointment date: 26 Sep 2021
Termination date: 06 Sep 2022
David John Pawson - officer
Appointment date: 23 Aug 2020
Termination date: 22 Nov 2021
Karen Faye Margaret Good - officer
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2020
Termination date: 28 Oct 2020
Trevor Thomas Raines - officer
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2020
Termination date: 28 Oct 2020
A Dog's Breakfast Limited
62 Wyon Street
Clad Worxs Limited
109 Buckleys Road
C+c Vetcall Limited
78 Buckleys Road
Planet Audio-tech Limited
21 Pauline Street
PĪki Kids Club Limited
7 Mclean Street
Kororatahi Creative Limited
74a Buckleys Road