Mike Singers Painting Services Limited was started on 14 Sep 2016 and issued an NZBN of 9429042564928. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Michael Singers - an active director whose contract began on 14 Sep 2016,
Rebekah Morrow - an inactive director whose contract began on 14 Sep 2016 and was terminated on 21 Aug 2017.
According to the BizDb information (last updated on 04 Sep 2024), this company uses 8 addresess: 75 Bruce Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 (registered address),
75 Bruce Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 (service address),
75 Bruce Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 (shareregister address),
Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 (postal address) among others.
Up to 13 May 2020, Mike Singers Painting Services Limited had been using Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Singers, Michael (a director) located at Glenview, Hamilton postcode 3206. Mike Singers Painting Services Limited is categorised as "Interior painting and decorating" (ANZSIC E324415).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery address used from 05 Jun 2019
Address #5: 1119 Cameron Road, Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Physical & registered & service address used from 13 May 2020
Address #6: Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Postal & delivery address used from 12 Apr 2023
Address #7: 75 Bruce Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 New Zealand
Shareregister address used from 12 Apr 2023
Address #8: 75 Bruce Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 20 Apr 2023
Principal place of activity
Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Mar 2018 to 13 May 2020
Address #2: 234a Waihi Road, Judea, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Sep 2016 to 13 Mar 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 02 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Singers, Michael |
Glenview Hamilton 3206 New Zealand |
14 Sep 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Rebekah Morrow |
Welcome Bay Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
14 Sep 2016 - 21 Aug 2017 |
Individual | Morrow, Rebekah |
Welcome Bay Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
14 Sep 2016 - 21 Aug 2017 |
Michael Singers - Director
Appointment date: 14 Sep 2016
Address: Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2023
Address: Gate Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2018
Address: Welcome Bay, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2016
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Nov 2017
Rebekah Morrow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Sep 2016
Termination date: 21 Aug 2017
Address: Welcome Bay, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Sep 2016
Talent Recruitment Limited
1/144 Third Ave
Kb & Co 2014 Limited
1/144 Third Ave
Bay Brokers Limited
2/115 Fourth Avenue
Maranda Holdings Limited
2/115 Fourth Avenue
Ravenscourt Finance Limited
2/115 Fourth Avenue
Von Dadelszen & Co Limited
2/115 Fourth Avenue
Dj Beer Painting & Decorating Limited
58 Wharf Street
M And L Adamson Limited
20 Park Street
Md And Kdf O'brien Limited
122a Darraghs Rd
Paintwork Nz Limited
4a Cynthia Place
Safari Painters (1989) Limited
47 Koromiko Street
Sam & Andy Painting & Decorating Limited
97 Edgecumbe Road