Mitchell Daysh Limited was incorporated on 15 Sep 2016 and issued an NZBN of 9429042538974. This registered LTD company has been run by 14 directors: John Clifford Kyle - an active director whose contract started on 15 Sep 2016,
Claire Elizabeth Hunter - an active director whose contract started on 20 Aug 2021,
Steven Sanderson - an active director whose contract started on 24 Aug 2022,
Paul Victor Doherty - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2024,
Richard Jonathan Turner - an inactive director whose contract started on 23 May 2024 and was terminated on 01 Jul 2024.
According to our information (updated on 15 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: Bowman Building, 7 Market Street, Napier, 4140 (category: registered, office).
Up to 21 Apr 2020, Mitchell Daysh Limited had been using Level 5 Burns House, 10 George Street, Dunedin as their registered address.
A total of 7435000 shares are allotted to 19 groups (25 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 100089 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Tuck, Steven (an individual) located at Welcome Bay, Tauranga postcode 3112.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 0.85% shares (exactly 63451 shares) and includes
Ca Trustees (2020) Limited - located at Frankton, Hamilton,
Henry, Lucy Rose - located at Hamilton East, Hamilton,
Henry, Mark Alan Clive - located at Hamilton East, Hamilton.
The third share allocation (45952 shares, 0.62%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Low, Adrian David, located at Rd 1, Nelson (an individual). Mitchell Daysh Limited has been categorised as "Environmental consultancy service - excluding laboratory service" (ANZSIC M696220).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Bowman Building, 7 Market Street, Napier, 4140 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Apr 2020
Principal place of activity
Bowman Building, 7 Market Street, Napier, 4140 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 5 Burns House, 10 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Feb 2020 to 21 Apr 2020
Address #2: Level 2 Clarion Building, 286 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Mar 2019 to 07 Feb 2020
Address #3: Level 1, 7 Falcon Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 May 2017 to 21 Mar 2019
Address #4: Level 1, 7 Falcon Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Sep 2016 to 02 May 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 7435000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 18 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100089 | |||
Individual | Tuck, Steven |
Welcome Bay Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 63451 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ca Trustees (2020) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048011174 |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2024 - |
Individual | Henry, Lucy Rose |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2024 - |
Individual | Henry, Mark Alan Clive |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 New Zealand |
14 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 45952 | |||
Individual | Low, Adrian David |
Rd 1 Nelson 7071 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 303183 | |||
Individual | Mckay, Philip Anthony |
Mayfair Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Individual | Mckay, Linda Mary |
Mayfair Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 371666 | |||
Individual | Hunter, Gregor James |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Individual | Hunter, Claire Elizabeth |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 86611 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kilauea Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034919392 |
Harrowfield Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 95292 | |||
Individual | Glover, Ethan John |
Mornington Dunedin 9011 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 146387 | |||
Other (Other) | Mason Daryl & Marcelle Maree Jackson |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
03 Dec 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #9 Number of Shares: 133748 | |||
Other (Other) | Abbie Maree Fowler And Christopher James Elliott |
Saint Andrews Hamilton 3200 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #10 Number of Shares: 61727 | |||
Individual | O'sullivan, Elliot Daniel |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Individual | O'sullivan, Kirsty Elizabeth |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Gca Legal Trustee 2018 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046566836 |
Dunedin 9054 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #11 Number of Shares: 122822 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mitchell Daysh Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042538974 |
7 Market Street Napier 4140 New Zealand |
24 Feb 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #12 Number of Shares: 103701 | |||
Director | Sanderson, Steven |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 New Zealand |
01 Feb 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #13 Number of Shares: 1351646 | |||
Individual | Mitchell, Philip Hunter |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #14 Number of Shares: 1004108 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Chrisp Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037330439 |
Hilltop Taupo 3330 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #15 Number of Shares: 1351645 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Daysh Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037330569 |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #16 Number of Shares: 1351645 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Three Princes Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032176957 |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #17 Number of Shares: 102041 | |||
Individual | Richardson, Doyle |
Invercargill 9876 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #18 Number of Shares: 139565 | |||
Individual | Faithfull, Luke Christopher James |
Western Springs Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #19 Number of Shares: 499721 | |||
Individual | Turner, Richard Jonathan |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Kirsten Jane Tebbutt, Dwayne Lance Tebbutt And Zig Zag Trustee Limited |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2020 - 26 May 2023 |
Individual | Jenkins, Rebekah |
Rd 2 Mosgiel 9092 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2022 - 19 Dec 2023 |
Individual | Taylor, Gareth Alexander |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Downie Stewart Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037156466 Company Number: 1061864 |
265 Princes Street, Level 8, John Wickliffe House,, Dunedin New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Justice Sunderland Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049161885 Company Number: 8171920 |
Wakari Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
13 May 2021 - 24 Feb 2023 |
Entity | Mitchell Daysh Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042538974 Company Number: 6094094 |
03 Dec 2021 - 14 Oct 2022 | |
Individual | Taylor, Louise Elizabeth Robertson |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Other | Kirsten Jane Tebbutt, Dwayne Lance Tebbutt And Zig Zag Trustee Limited |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2020 - 26 May 2023 |
Individual | Taylor, Gareth Alexander |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Taylor, Louise Elizabeth Robertson |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Taylor, Louise Elizabeth Robertson |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Taylor, Louise Elizabeth Robertson |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Mitchell Family Investment Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038158292 Company Number: 842800 |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 25 Nov 2020 |
Entity | Bendall Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041935378 Company Number: 5781494 |
Havelock North 4130 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 21 Jun 2019 |
Entity | Mitchell Daysh Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042538974 Company Number: 6094094 |
7 Market Street Napier 4140 New Zealand |
03 Dec 2021 - 14 Oct 2022 |
Entity | Mitchell Daysh Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042538974 Company Number: 6094094 |
7 Market Street Napier 4140 New Zealand |
03 Dec 2021 - 14 Oct 2022 |
Individual | Taylor, Gareth Alexander |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Downie Stewart Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037156466 Company Number: 1061864 |
265 Princes Street, Level 8, John Wickliffe House,, Dunedin New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Mitchell Family Investment Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038158292 Company Number: 842800 |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 25 Nov 2020 |
Entity | Downie Stewart Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037156466 Company Number: 1061864 |
265 Princes Street, Level 8, John Wickliffe House,, Dunedin New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Mitchell Family Investment Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038158292 Company Number: 842800 |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 25 Nov 2020 |
Individual | Taylor, Louise Elizabeth Robertson |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Taylor, Gareth Alexander |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Taylor, Gareth Alexander |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Downie Stewart Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037156466 Company Number: 1061864 |
265 Princes Street, Level 8, John Wickliffe House,, Dunedin New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Entity | Downie Stewart Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037156466 Company Number: 1061864 |
265 Princes Street, Level 8, John Wickliffe House,, Dunedin New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Individual | Justice, Megan |
Wakari Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - 13 May 2021 |
Individual | Justice, Megan |
Wakari Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
28 Jun 2018 - 13 May 2021 |
Entity | Bendall Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041935378 Company Number: 5781494 |
308 Queen Street East Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 21 Jun 2019 |
Entity | Bendall Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041935378 Company Number: 5781494 |
308 Queen Street East Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2016 - 21 Jun 2019 |
John Clifford Kyle - Director
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Address: Maori Hill, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Claire Elizabeth Hunter - Director
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2021
Address: Maori Hill, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2021
Steven Sanderson - Director
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2022
Address: Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2022
Paul Victor Doherty - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2024
Address: Kerikeri, Northland, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2024
Richard Jonathan Turner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 May 2024
Termination date: 01 Jul 2024
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 23 May 2024
Adrian David Low - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2021
Termination date: 23 May 2024
Address: Rd 1, Nelson, 7071 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2021
Richard Turner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2018
Termination date: 15 Jan 2024
Address: Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2019
Megan Justice - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2021
Termination date: 06 Oct 2022
Address: Wakari, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2021
Mark Bulpitt Chrisp - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 20 Aug 2021
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Louise Elizabeth Robertson Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 20 Aug 2021
Address: Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Simon Donald Bendall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 31 Mar 2019
Address: Kinloch, Rd1 Taupo, 3377 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Stephen Graeme Daysh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 31 Oct 2018
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Richard John Matthews - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 31 Oct 2018
Address: Harrowfield, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
Philip Hunter Mitchell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2016
Termination date: 31 Oct 2018
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2016
The Fusion Group Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Crp & Njp Investments Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Tfa Crp & Njp Trustee Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Reflection Treatment Systems Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Ledlight Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Tfa Coulthard Miller Trustee Limited
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace
Erosion Control Co Limited
Business Success Group Limited
Jpstyles Limited
Level 0, 308 Parnell Road
Oceana Property Investments 2020 Limited
Suite 7036, 17b Farnham Street
Papatuanuku Properties Limited
C/- Gilligan Rowe & Associates Ltd
Prow Consulting Limited
C/o Gilligan Rowe & Associates Limited
Urban Design Limited
32 Laurie Avenue