Eastern Ocean Valley Limited was launched on 20 Jun 2016 and issued an NZ business number of 9429042417781. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Wei Wang - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jun 2016,
Xiaohua Chen - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 Jun 2016 and was terminated on 26 Jul 2023,
Xiaowen Cui - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Sep 2016 and was terminated on 26 Jul 2023.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 09 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 4 Ingham Court, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 (category: registered, service).
A total of 2000000 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 2000000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Wang, Wei (a director) located at Fairview Heights, Auckland postcode 0632. Eastern Ocean Valley Limited was categorised as "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150).
Principal place of activity
83 Sunnyside Road, Rd 3, Albany, 0793 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 04 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 2000000 | |||
Director | Wang, Wei |
Fairview Heights Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cui, Xiaowen |
Rd 3 Albany 0793 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2016 - 26 Jul 2023 |
Individual | Chen, Xiaohua |
Rd 3 Albany 0793 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2016 - 26 Jul 2023 |
Individual | Chen, Xiaohua |
Rd 3 Albany 0793 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2016 - 26 Jul 2023 |
Wei Wang - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2016
Address: Fairview Heights, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2023
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2016
Address: Rd 3, Coatesville, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2020
Xiaohua Chen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Jun 2016
Termination date: 26 Jul 2023
Address: Rd 3, Albany, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2016
Xiaowen Cui - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2016
Termination date: 26 Jul 2023
Address: Rd 3, Albany, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Samwood International Trading Limited
83 Sunnyside Road
Twin Lakes Garden Management Limited
83 Sunnyside Road
Ocean Valley Land Limited
83 Sunnyside Road
Perfetto Investment Limited
64 Sunnyside Road
Perfetto Growing Limited
64 Sunnyside Road
Superb Software Limited
121 Robinson Road
Allen Nominees Limited
136 Three Oaks Drive
Citysky Limited
430b Sunnyside Road
Coatesvale Limited
406e Sunnyside Road
Glenmore Holdings Limited
78 Glenmore Road
Jwinvest Limited
53 Lynton Masters Lane
Klaargesukkel Limited
1001 Coatesville-riverhead Highway