Tv Av Installations Limited was registered on 02 Jun 2016 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042381600. The registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named Jared Coldwell Coombes - an active director whose contract started on 02 Jun 2016.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 18 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (category: registered, service).
Until 18 Jun 2021, Tv Av Installations Limited had been using 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names for the company: from 30 May 2016 to 20 Oct 2020 they were named Jacman Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Coombes, Jared Coldwell (a director) located at Te Puke, Te Puke postcode 3119.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Coombes, Kelly-Ann - located at Te Puke, Te Puke. Tv Av Installations Limited is classified as "Cable laying" (business classification E310903).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 Apr 2023
Address #5: 7 Mountbatten Place, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 New Zealand
Service address used from 27 Apr 2023
Principal place of activity
23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Mar 2021 to 18 Jun 2021
Address #2: 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Apr 2018 to 24 Mar 2021
Address #3: Suite 1, 314 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Jun 2016 to 06 Apr 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 27 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Coombes, Jared Coldwell |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Coombes, Kelly-ann |
Te Puke Te Puke 3119 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2016 - |
Jared Coldwell Coombes - Director
Appointment date: 02 Jun 2016
Address: Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2017
Bay Of Plenty Chiropractic Centre Limited
23 Myres Street
Reform Limited
33 Myres Street
Yeovil Investments Limited
41 Myres Street
Plumbing Fix Limited
49 Myres Street
Erigra Investments Limited
177 Pillans Road
Mctavish-huriwai Investments Limited
52 Goods Road
Complete Cabling & Provisioning Limited
5 Richardson Street
Elektron Group Limited
K P M G, 11th Floor K P M G Centre,
Essential Connections Limited
6 Cherry Way
Ethereum Network Limited
19/100 Millers Rd Brookfield
Gopherit Limited
1026 Victoria Street
Telco Holdings Limited
95 Devonport Road