Liquor Mart Limited, a registered company, was started on 12 Apr 2016. 9429042290575 is the NZBN it was issued. "Liquor store" (business classification G412310) is how the company is classified. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Ning Xu - an active director whose contract began on 11 Aug 2017,
Yao Qian - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Apr 2016 and was terminated on 15 Aug 2017.
Last updated on 31 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 128 Arran Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 (types include: registered, physical).
Liquor Mart Limited had been using 8 Squirrel Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland as their registered address until 12 Nov 2021.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 30 shares (30 per cent) held by 2 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 35 shares (35 per cent). Finally there is the 3rd share allotment (35 shares 35 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
8 Squirrel Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Previous address
Address: 8 Squirrel Lane, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Apr 2016 to 12 Nov 2021
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 09 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Individual | Qian, Yao |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - |
Director | Yao Qian |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 35 | |||
Individual | Xu, Ning |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 35 | |||
Individual | Chen, Na |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - |
Ning Xu - Director
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Dec 2021
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Yao Qian - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Apr 2016
Termination date: 15 Aug 2017
Address: Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2016
Quattro Advantage Limited
17 Squirrel Lane
Global Vision Nz Private Limited
59a Oaktree Avenue
Class Locks Limited
16 Squirrel Lane
Wks Investments Limited
18 Squirrel Lane
Cj Design Envy Limited
5 Squirrel Lane
Lambourne Professional Services Limited
2/ 83 Arran Road
30 The Avenue Limited
11 Melmore Place
Anonie New Zealand Limited
84 Knights Road
Bacchus Wines Limited
13 Squirrel Lane
Bottle Shop Limited
8 Squirrel Lane
Fine Wine Shop Limited
8 Squirrel Lane, Browns Bay
Liquor Star Limited
Flat 2, 681 Beach Road