N.c.service Limited was launched on 04 Apr 2016 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042274537. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Junhai Huang - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2018,
Junhai Huang - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Apr 2016 and was terminated on 01 Aug 2019,
Yongchang Zhou - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2018 and was terminated on 02 Jul 2018.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 29 Jul 2024), the company uses 1 address: 42A Colmar Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 (category: registered, service).
Until 15 Sep 2020, N.c.service Limited had been using 11A Invermay Avenue, Mount Roskill, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Huang, Junhai (an individual) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014,
Junhai Huang (a director) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019. N.c.service Limited was categorised as "Construction services - all trades subcontracted" (ANZSIC E329920).
Principal place of activity
151 Bleakhouse Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 11a Invermay Avenue, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Aug 2019 to 15 Sep 2020
Address #2: 44 Hughs Way, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2016 to 12 Aug 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 06 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Huang, Junhai |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2020 - |
Director | Junhai Huang |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
04 Apr 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Zhou, Yongchang |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2019 - 19 Mar 2020 |
Individual | Huang, Junhai |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
04 Apr 2016 - 02 Aug 2019 |
Individual | Zhou, Shenghuang |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
08 May 2020 - 08 Sep 2022 |
Individual | Yang, Jie |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
15 Jun 2016 - 16 Aug 2017 |
Individual | Zhang, Ling |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
26 May 2016 - 24 Jul 2016 |
Junhai Huang - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2018
Address: Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2020
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2018
Junhai Huang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Apr 2016
Termination date: 01 Aug 2019
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2016
Yongchang Zhou - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2018
Termination date: 02 Jul 2018
Address: Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2018
System Panda Limited
48 Hughs Way
V & R Business Services Limited
54 Hughs Way
Chasedream Construction Limited
56 Hughs Way
G & H Trading Limited
13 Dunkineely Road
Katie And Lina Nails Limited
12 Ballindrait Drive
Anm Holdings Limited
4 Bruckless Drive
Freshways Nz Limited
2 Alexia Place
Imperial Insulation Limited
68 Goodwood Drive
Imperial Supplies Limited
68 Goodwood Drive
Nuline Homes Nz Limited
Unit 1, 15 Accent Drive
Performance Plasterers Limited
17 Savina Court
Spvd Trades Limited
Suite 3, 277 Te Irirangi Drive