Sa & Tl Limited was started on 25 Nov 2015 and issued a business number of 9429042086062. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Torran Paul Blake Lepper - an active director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2015,
Sharon Auker - an active director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2015.
According to our information (last updated on 10 Dec 2020), the company filed 1 address: 249 Frankley Road, Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310 (type: physical, registered).
Up until 07 Nov 2019, Sa & Tl Limited had been using 247 Frankley Road, Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Torran Lepper (a director) located at Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth postcode 4310.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Sharon Auker - located at Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth. Sa & Tl Limited is classified as "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060).
Previous addresses
Address: 247 Frankley Road, Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Oct 2019 to 07 Nov 2019
Address: 293 Huatoki Street, Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Nov 2015 to 15 Oct 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Torran Paul Blake Lepper |
Upper Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Sharon Auker |
Frankleigh Park New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
25 Nov 2015 - |
Torran Paul Blake Lepper - Director
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2015
Address: Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2019
Address: Highlands Park, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2015
Sharon Auker - Director
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2015
Address: Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Oct 2019
Address: Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2015
Chris Pulford Trustee Company Limited
293 Huatoki Street
Bunter Estates Limited
298 Huatoki Street
Taranaki Plumbing & Gas Services Limited
397 Carrington Road
Web Applications Limited
37c Manu Crescent
Manu Peak Limited
37c Manu Crescent
Henderson Contract Welding Limited
44 Saxton Road
B S A Travel Limited
B.d.o. Spicers
Bev`s Travel Limited
487b Devon Street
Dtm Global Group Limited
3/17 Leatham Avenue
K.star Limited
6 Devon Street West
Kiwi Travel Nz 2017 Limited
7 Liardet Street
On Safari Limited
14 Te Arakete Place