Conamen Limited was started on 24 Aug 2015 and issued a business number of 9429041941072. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Andrzej Kazimierz Krzyszczak-Kohut - an active director whose contract began on 06 Oct 2015,
Tamara Anna Krzyszczak-Kohut - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Aug 2015 and was terminated on 13 Oct 2015.
As stated in our information (last updated on 05 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 20 Taupata Lane, Helensville, Helensville, 0800 (type: registered, service).
Until 04 Dec 2023, Conamen Limited had been using 726 Inland Road, Rd 2, Helensville as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Krzyszczak-Kohut, Andrzej Kazimierz (an individual) located at Helensville, Helensville postcode 0800. Conamen Limited is classified as "Health service nec" (business classification Q859940).
Principal place of activity
Unit 3, 90 Wharenui Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 726 Inland Road, Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 05 Dec 2022 to 04 Dec 2023
Address #2: Unit 3 14 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Apr 2017 to 30 Aug 2019
Address #3: 119 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Sep 2015 to 20 Apr 2017
Address #4: 218 Cannon Hill Crescent, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Aug 2015 to 08 Sep 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 23 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Krzyszczak-kohut, Andrzej Kazimierz |
Helensville Helensville 0800 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Krzyszczak-kohut, Tamara Anna |
Upper Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2015 - 06 Oct 2015 |
Director | Tamara Anna Krzyszczak-kohut |
Upper Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2015 - 06 Oct 2015 |
Andrzej Kazimierz Krzyszczak-kohut - Director
Appointment date: 06 Oct 2015
Address: Helensville, Helensville, 0800 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 2023
Address: Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2022
Address: Linwood, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2016
Tamara Anna Krzyszczak-kohut - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2015
Termination date: 13 Oct 2015
Address: Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2015
Hydraulic Hose Nz Limited
14 Hazeldean Road
Cogs Limited
3/14 Hazeldean Road,
Efficiency Leaders (nz) Limited
3/14 Hazeldean Road
Albatross Backpackers Limited
14 Hazeldean Road
Timber Treatments (2017) Limited
3/14 Hazeldean Road
Southern Fire Systems Limited
3/14 Hazeldean Road
Comhar Nz Limited
61 Evesham Crescent
Gpdocs Limited
44 Braddon Street
Nourish To Flourish Nz Limited
Unit 6, 5 Cass Street
Rdj Fitness Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Rivendell Holdings Limited
16 Bay Road
Senscio Limited
C/- Peter Blacklaws Chartered Accountant