Mcleod Trustee Company Limited was started on 30 Jul 2015 and issued an NZBN of 9429041876596. This registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Craig Michael Brockliss - an active director whose contract began on 27 Mar 2018,
Matthew Graeme Bellingham - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Jul 2015 and was terminated on 27 Mar 2018,
Aaron James Wallace - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Jul 2015 and was terminated on 27 Mar 2018,
Michael Paul Atkinson - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Jul 2015 and was terminated on 27 Mar 2018.
According to our information (updated on 15 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (category: registered, physical).
Up until 11 Apr 2022, Mcleod Trustee Company Limited had been using 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 168 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 168 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Brockliss, Craig Michael (an individual) located at Rd 3, Albany, Auckland postcode 0793. Mcleod Trustee Company Limited is categorised as "Legal service" (ANZSIC M693130).
Previous address
Address: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Jul 2015 to 11 Apr 2022
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 168
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 09 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 168 | |||
Individual | Brockliss, Craig Michael |
Rd 3, Albany Auckland 0793 New Zealand |
20 Apr 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bellingham, Matthew Graeme |
Rd 3 Albany 0793 New Zealand |
30 Jul 2015 - 20 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Wallace, Aaron James |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Jul 2015 - 20 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Atkinson, Michael Paul |
Redvale Albany 0792 New Zealand |
30 Jul 2015 - 20 Apr 2018 |
Craig Michael Brockliss - Director
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2018
Address: Rd 3, Albany, Auckland, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Mar 2018
Matthew Graeme Bellingham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jul 2015
Termination date: 27 Mar 2018
Address: Rd 3, Albany, 0793 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2015
Aaron James Wallace - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jul 2015
Termination date: 27 Mar 2018
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2015
Michael Paul Atkinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jul 2015
Termination date: 27 Mar 2018
Address: Redvale, Albany, 0792 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2015
Farrah Breads Limited
470 Parnell Road
Weston Mcdonald Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
The House Company Limited
470 Parnell Road
Takutai Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Hicks Family Trustees Limited
470 Parnell Road
Leo Peng Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Anthony Grant Limited
16a St Georges Bay Road
Corporate Counsel Limited
2a Railway Street
Cygnus Law Limited
6 Clayton Street
Speakman Law Trustee Services Limited
Level 1, 7 Windsor Street
Trustee 1006-3422 Limited
Suite 14
Whitburn Group Limited
Ground Floor, 272 Parnell Road