Uq65 Limited was registered on 30 Jun 2015 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041824610. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Christopher Neil Meikle - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jun 2015,
Feng Zhan - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jun 2015,
Nicholas Roy Topp - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jun 2015.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 01 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, 4310 (category: physical, registered).
Up to 07 May 2019, Uq65 Limited had been using 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth as their physical address.
A total of 150 shares are issued to 3 groups (7 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Meikle Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Waiatarua, Auckland postcode 0604.
The second group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 33.33 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Zhan, Wei - located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Wang, Xiao Wen - located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Zhan, Feng - located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland.
The 3rd share allocation (50 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Norwood, Wendy Jill, located at Devonport, Auckland (an individual),
Patterson, Bruce Reginald, located at Kohimarama, Auckland (an individual),
Topp, Nicholas Roy, located at Devonport, Auckland (a director).
Previous address
Address: 109-113 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jun 2015 to 07 May 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 150
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 29 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Meikle Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049142174 |
Waiatarua Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Zhan, Wei |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
31 May 2022 - |
Individual | Wang, Xiao Wen |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - |
Director | Zhan, Feng |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Norwood, Wendy Jill |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - |
Individual | Patterson, Bruce Reginald |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - |
Director | Topp, Nicholas Roy |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Richards, Bruce Carlaw |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 29 Apr 2021 |
Individual | Meikle, Diane Dawn |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 01 Jul 2021 |
Individual | Zhan, Zhi Cheng |
Half Moon Bay Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 31 May 2022 |
Individual | Meikle, Diane Dawn |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 01 Jul 2021 |
Director | Meikle, Christopher Neil |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 01 Jul 2021 |
Director | Meikle, Christopher Neil |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2015 - 01 Jul 2021 |
Christopher Neil Meikle - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2015
Address: Waiatarua, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2023
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2015
Feng Zhan - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2015
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2015
Nicholas Roy Topp - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2015
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2015
T & L Uhlenberg Trustee Limited
109 Powderham Street
Gordon Monmouth Trustee Company Limited
109-113 Powderham Street
Rbs Invest Limited
109 Powderham Street
Kotuku (2012) Limited
2nd Floor, Staples Rodway Bldg
I & N Butler Nominees Limited
109-113 Powderham Street
Soil And Plant Health Limited
109 Powderham Street