Cvc Investment Limited was incorporated on 25 Jun 2015 and issued a business number of 9429041821800. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Feng Chen - an active director whose contract began on 25 Jun 2015,
Jingzhong Chen - an active director whose contract began on 25 Jun 2015,
Liang Jiao - an active director whose contract began on 07 Sep 2022.
As stated in our information (updated on 26 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 12 Jun 2019, Cvc Investment Limited had been using 9A Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Xing, Wei (an individual) located at Wigram, Christchurch postcode 8042.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 90 per cent shares (exactly 90 shares) and includes
Chen, Jingzhong - located at 125 Qixing Street, Nanning. Cvc Investment Limited is classified as "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030).
Previous addresses
Address: 9a Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 May 2019 to 12 Jun 2019
Address: Unit 9, 41 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jun 2017 to 24 May 2019
Address: 83 Rannoch Drive, Broomfield, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Aug 2016 to 07 Jun 2017
Address: 329 Durham Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Jun 2015 to 05 Aug 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 23 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Xing, Wei |
Wigram Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
25 Jun 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Director | Chen, Jingzhong |
125 Qixing Street Nanning China |
25 Jun 2015 - |
Feng Chen - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2015
ASIC Name: Australia Yichuan International Trading Pty Ltd
Address: Magill, South Australia, 5072 Australia
Address used since 21 Sep 2022
Address: Parkside, South Australia, 5063 Australia
Address: Broomfield, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jun 2015
Address: Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2019
Jingzhong Chen - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2015
Address: No. 125 Qixing Road, Qingxiu District, Nanning City 0771, 2610281 China
Address used since 21 Sep 2022
Address: 125 Qixing Street, Nanning, China
Address used since 25 Jun 2015
Liang Jiao - Director
Appointment date: 07 Sep 2022
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2022
Kpk Cleaning Limited
125 Rannoch Drive
Xinsheng International Investments Limited
78 Rannoch Drive
Nz Pensions Limited
3 Carradale Avenue
Meraki Dental Design Limited
4 Carradale Avenue
Lily Trading Limited
6 Dunaverty Place
Ajkk Limited
10 Kilbrannan Close
Aucom Holdings Limited
92 Russley Road
Clearwater Packaging Limited
92 Russley Road
Greenland Capital Holdings Limited
545 Yaldhurst Road
Matthew Higgs Trustee Limited
92 Russley Road
Southern Corporation Limited
92 Russley Road
Srl Nz Limited
92 Russley Road