Tactiv (Nz) Limited, a registered company, was started on 25 Jun 2015. 9429041800072 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Software development service nec" (business classification M700050) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 5 directors: Simon Sword Warner - an active director whose contract began on 25 Jun 2015,
Nikola Vassilev Vassilev - an active director whose contract began on 12 Apr 2021,
Damien Paul Zeller - an active director whose contract began on 12 Apr 2021,
Malcolm Roger Fong - an active director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2021,
Bardhold Blecken - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Jun 2015 and was terminated on 09 Apr 2021.
Last updated on 06 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 1St Floor 178 Hibiscus Highway, Orewa, Auckland 0932, 0000 (type: registered, physical).
Tactiv (Nz) Limited had been using 1St Floor 178 Hibiscus Highway, Orewa, Auckland 0932 as their registered address up until 24 May 2021.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Tactiv Pty Ltd - located at 0000, South Brisbane, Queensland.
Previous address
Address #1: 1st Floor 178 Hibiscus Highway, Orewa, Auckland 0932, 0000 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Jun 2015 to 24 May 2021
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 16 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Other (Other) | Tactiv Pty Ltd |
South Brisbane Queensland 4101 Australia |
25 Jun 2015 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Simon Sword Warner - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2015
ASIC Name: Tactiv Pty Ltd
Address: Murphy Creek, Queensland, 4352 Australia
Address used since 25 Jun 2015
Address: South Brisbane, Queensland, 4101 Australia
Address: Brisbane, Queensland, 4000 Australia
Nikola Vassilev Vassilev - Director
Appointment date: 12 Apr 2021
ASIC Name: Tactiv Pty Ltd
Address: Holland Park West, Queensland, 4121 Australia
Address used since 12 Apr 2021
Address: Brisbane, Queensland, 4000 Australia
Damien Paul Zeller - Director
Appointment date: 12 Apr 2021
ASIC Name: Tactiv Pty Ltd
Address: Enoggera, Queensland, 4051 Australia
Address used since 12 Apr 2021
Address: Brisbane, Queensland, 4000 Australia
Malcolm Roger Fong - Director
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2021
Address: Greenslopes, Queeensland, 4120 Australia
Address used since 15 Apr 2021
Bardhold Blecken - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Jun 2015
Termination date: 09 Apr 2021
ASIC Name: Tactiv Pty Ltd
Address: South Brisbane, Queensland, 4101 Australia
Address: Miami, Queensland, 4220 Australia
Address used since 14 Feb 2017
Address: Brisbane, Queensland, 4000 Australia
Aylett Investigations Limited
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Kerry Wells Trust Services Limited
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Ckings Limited
1st Floor
Holloway Trustees Limited
1st Floor 178
Riverside Property Concepts Limited
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway
R G Barge Limited
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Blender Studio Limited
20 Marellen Drive
Hermetech International Limited
170 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Nagrua Limited
3/137 Lakeside Drive
Skypepop Limited
170 Hibiscus Coast Highway
Vendo Limited
43c Riverside Road
Zettabit Limited
38 Bay Vista Drive