Te Whare Hukahuka Limited, a registered company, was started on 25 Mar 2015. 9429041673737 is the business number it was issued. "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Travis Ira Okeefe - an active director whose contract began on 25 Mar 2015,
Shay Wright - an active director whose contract began on 25 Mar 2015.
Last updated on 24 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 494, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3450 (type: postal, registered).
Te Whare Hukahuka Limited had been using Level 4, 117 St Georges Bay Road,, Parnell, Auckland as their physical address until 19 Jun 2018.
A total of 1000000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 500000 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 500000 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 80 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Office address used from 18 Jun 2019
Address #5: 24 Anzac Parade, Hamilton, 3240 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 11 Oct 2023
Address #6: Po Box 494, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3450 New Zealand
Postal address used from 26 Jun 2024
Principal place of activity
80 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 4, 117 St Georges Bay Road,, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Jul 2017 to 19 Jun 2018
Address #2: Level 4, 117 St Georges Bay Road,, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Jul 2017 to 25 Jun 2018
Address #3: 39 Jellicoe Street, Martinborough, 5711 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 May 2015 to 06 Jul 2017
Address #4: 117 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Mar 2015 to 08 May 2015
Address #5: 117 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Mar 2015 to 06 Jul 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 26 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500000 | |||
Director | Wright, Shay |
Rd 1 Kaitaia 0481 New Zealand |
25 Mar 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500000 | |||
Director | Okeefe, Travis Ira |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
25 Mar 2015 - |
Travis Ira Okeefe - Director
Appointment date: 25 Mar 2015
Address: Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2023
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Jun 2018
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2015
Shay Wright - Director
Appointment date: 25 Mar 2015
Address: Rd 1, Kaitaia, 0481 New Zealand
Address used since 05 May 2022
Address: Rd 1, Upper Hutt, 5371 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Feb 2021
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Sep 2018
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Mar 2015
Peace In 10,000 Hands Limited
80 Queen Street
New Zealand Seniors Insurance Agency Limited
80 Queen Street
Collective Hospitality Limited
80 Queen Street
Deloitte Nominee Company Limited
80 Queen Street
Excellent Trust Property Limited
80 Queen Street
Wynrie Forest Limited
80 Queen Street
Development Advisory Services Limited
Level 7
Epic Studios Limited
Quest On Queen 62 Queen Street
Ezygrowth Limited
Level 5
Ignition Partner Limited
Deloitte Touche Tohmatsu
Propero Consulting Limited
1 Shortland St
Tunz Finance Limited
Level 5