New Zealand Yinjue Holidays Limited was registered on 15 Jan 2015 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041569375. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Furong Zhang - an active director whose contract began on 15 Jan 2015,
Song Wu - an active director whose contract began on 15 Jan 2015,
Shruti Kamat - an active director whose contract began on 08 Sep 2021,
Nathan Gerard Stanton - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Aug 2016 and was terminated on 15 Oct 2019.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 03 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: Level 1, 6 Johnsonville Road, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 (type: registered, physical).
Up until 14 Jul 2020, New Zealand Yinjue Holidays Limited had been using 24B Moorefield Rd, Johnsonville, Wellington as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Zhang, Furong (a director) located at Jiaxing, Zhejiang postcode 314000.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Wu, Song - located at Jiaxing, Zhejiang. New Zealand Yinjue Holidays Limited is classified as "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060).
Principal place of activity
24b Moorefield Road, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 24b Moorefield Rd, Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Sep 2015 to 14 Jul 2020
Address: 9 Dublin Street, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Jan 2015 to 03 Sep 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Zhang, Furong |
Jiaxing Zhejiang 314000 China |
15 Jan 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Wu, Song |
Jiaxing, Zhejiang 314000 China |
15 Jan 2015 - |
Furong Zhang - Director
Appointment date: 15 Jan 2015
Address: Yichang, Hubei, 443000 China
Address used since 18 Aug 2016
Song Wu - Director
Appointment date: 15 Jan 2015
Address: Jiaxing, 314000 China
Address used since 09 Sep 2021
Address: Johnsonville, Wellington, 6037 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Oct 2019
Address: Yichang, Hubei, 443000 China
Address used since 18 Nov 2015
Shruti Kamat - Director
Appointment date: 08 Sep 2021
Address: Stokes Valley, Lower Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Apr 2022
Address: Totara Park, Upper Hutt, 5018 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2021
Nathan Gerard Stanton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Aug 2016
Termination date: 15 Oct 2019
Address: Glen Innes, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Aug 2016
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Mar 2017
Ics Multimedia Pty Ltd
24b Moorefield Road
Echtze Limited
Suite 3648 24b Moorefield Rd
Fihr Limited
Suite 3648, 24b Moorefield Rd
Dryzone Nz Limited
Suite 3304, 24b Moorefield Road
Carr's Supplements (nz) Limited
24b Moorefield Road
Mede Cen Limited
24 Moorefield Road
Dcnz Consulting Limited
144 Homebush Rd
Isz Trading Limited
110 Broderick Road
Nz Holiday Homes Limited
40 Kanpur Road
Raukikini Limited
57c John Sims Drive
Samax Travel Limited
70 Kipling Street
The Promise Limited
192 Mark Avenue