Lucstar (Nz) Limited was started on 28 Nov 2014 and issued a number of 9429041505977. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Teik Huat Ghee - an active director whose contract started on 28 Nov 2014,
Aaron Teik Huat Ghee - an active director whose contract started on 28 Nov 2014.
According to our database (updated on 06 Jan 2022), the company uses 1 address: 40 George Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 12 Nov 2021, Lucstar (Nz) Limited had been using 95 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 600 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Sentry Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 40 per cent shares (exactly 400 shares) and includes
Lucstar (Nz) Investment Limited - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. Lucstar (Nz) Limited is classified as "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150).
Previous addresses
Address: 95 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Nov 2019 to 12 Nov 2021
Address: 176 Kepa Road, Orakei, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 25 Oct 2019 to 25 Nov 2019
Address: 12a Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Sep 2018 to 25 Oct 2019
Address: 12a Jack Conway Avenue, Manukau, Auckland, 2103 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Oct 2016 to 13 Sep 2018
Address: Level 1, 144 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1151 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Nov 2014 to 07 Oct 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 04 Nov 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sentry Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041030547 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
28 Nov 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 400 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Lucstar (nz) Investment Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041516454 |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
28 Nov 2014 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Teik Huat Ghee - Director
Appointment date: 28 Nov 2014
Address: Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2018
Aaron Teik Huat Ghee - Director
Appointment date: 28 Nov 2014
Address: Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Nov 2014
Address: Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Sep 2017
Cpr Property Maintenance Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Tranquility Service Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Kiwi Oil Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Sportfolio (uk) Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Ronald Young Trustee Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Holistic Holdings Nz Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Archaus Holdings Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Clifton Residential Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Fyvie Holdings Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Higgins Waipu Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
Sentry Holdings Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue
St Andrew Residential Limited
12a Jack Conway Avenue