Mk Trustee (K & S Patel) Limited was incorporated on 14 Oct 2014 and issued a business number of 9429041440025. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 6 directors: Murray George Harden - an active director whose contract began on 14 Oct 2014,
Andrew James Stewart - an active director whose contract began on 14 Oct 2014,
Matthew Peter Whimp - an active director whose contract began on 14 Oct 2014,
Jamie Nicholas Callinicos Nunns - an active director whose contract began on 21 Nov 2023,
Tessa Faye Doherty - an active director whose contract began on 21 Nov 2023.
As stated in our information (last updated on 06 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 07 Aug 2019, Mk Trustee (K & S Patel) Limited had been using 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Morrison Kent Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. Mk Trustee (K & S Patel) Limited is classified as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Previous address
Address: 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Oct 2014 to 07 Aug 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 19 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Morrison Kent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035413851 |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
30 Jul 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Whimp, Matthew Peter |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2014 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Director | Stewart, Andrew James |
Karori Wellington 6012 New Zealand |
14 Oct 2014 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Murray George Harden - Director
Appointment date: 14 Oct 2014
Address: Raumati South, Paraparaumu, 5032 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2022
Address: Whitby, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Address: Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2014
Andrew James Stewart - Director
Appointment date: 14 Oct 2014
Address: Karori, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2014
Matthew Peter Whimp - Director
Appointment date: 14 Oct 2014
Address: Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Nov 2016
Jamie Nicholas Callinicos Nunns - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2023
Address: Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Nov 2023
Tessa Faye Doherty - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2023
Address: Rd 1, Porirua, 5381 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Nov 2023
Richard Hudson Caughley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Oct 2014
Termination date: 08 Nov 2023
Address: Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2020
Address: Wadestown, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2014
Karma Drinks Limited
Level 19
Mk Trustee (ktg) Limited
105 The Terrace
Rosco Ice Cream Limited
105 The Terrace
Wayfairer Limited
Level 19
Alco Trustee Limited
Level 19
All Good Bananas Limited
Level 19
Mk Trustee (bar) Limited
Level 19, Morrison Kent House
Mk Trustee (cnz) Limited
105 The Terrace
Mk Trustee (fst) Limited
Level 19, Morrison Kent House
Mk Trustee (gwft) Limited
105 The Terrace
Mk Trustee (mvt) Limited
Level 19, Morrison Kent House
Mk Trustee (tvp) Limited
Level 19, Morrison Kent House