Tiger Tyres (Nz) Limited was registered on 05 Aug 2014 and issued an NZ business number of 9429041354117. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Byron John Duncan - an active director whose contract started on 05 Aug 2014.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 18 Jul 2024), this company registered 3 addresses: 38 Bridge Street A, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (office address),
38 Bridge Street A, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (delivery address),
38 Bridge Street A, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (postal address),
38 Bridge Street A, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (physical address) among others.
Until 29 May 2019, Tiger Tyres (Nz) Limited had been using 1 Clive Square West, Napier South, Napier as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Duncan, Byron John (a director) located at Rd 2, Napier postcode 4182.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Oh, Hyun Soon - located at Rd 2, Napier. Tiger Tyres (Nz) Limited was classified as "Tyre or tube for motor vehicle - retailing" (ANZSIC G392210).
Principal place of activity
38 Bridge Street A, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1 Clive Square West, Napier South, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Jul 2018 to 29 May 2019
Address #2: 36 Argyll Crescent, Tamatea, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Registered address used from 05 Aug 2014 to 06 Jul 2018
Address #3: 36 Argyll Crescent, Tamatea, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Aug 2014 to 29 May 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 06 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Duncan, Byron John |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Oh, Hyun Soon |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2014 - |
Byron John Duncan - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2014
Address: Rd 2, Napier, 4182 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2022
Address: Rd 2, Napier, 4182 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2014
Contracting Services (hb) Limited
36 Argyll Crescent
Padanne Properties Limited
36 Argyll Crescent
Spacifically Pacific Hawke's Bay Charitable Trust
271 Westminster Avenue
Mildon Plumbing Limited
16 Essex Street
Hawkes Bay Itf Limited
25 Sutherland Street
Special Needs Taekwon-do Federation Of New Zealand
25 Sutherland Street
Bay Tyres Hastings Limited
47 Austin Street
Bay Tyres Limited
47 Austin Street
Kerry's Tyres Limited
Anz Bank Building, Level One
Larsen Automotive Limited
4 Watts Street
Tyre Shop Online Limited
28 York Avenue
Village Tyres Limited
1 Cooper Street