Solid Roofing Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 24 Jul 2014. 9429041338025 is the number it was issued. "Construction project management service - fee or contract basis" (business classification M692325) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Peter Vandenberg - an active director whose contract started on 10 Dec 2014,
David Philip Barton - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jul 2014 and was terminated on 12 Dec 2014.
Last updated on 14 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 5 Argus Place, Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 (types include: registered, service).
Solid Roofing Limited had been using 31A Amante Cresent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland as their registered address until 10 Jul 2023.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Vandenberg, Peter - located at 0627, Mairangi Bay, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 31a Amante Cresent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 13 Feb 2023 to 10 Jul 2023
Address #2: 42 Springvale Drive, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Feb 2021 to 16 Feb 2022
Address #3: 24 Springvale Drive, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Jun 2020 to 12 Feb 2021
Address #4: 200 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Physical address used from 04 Jul 2017 to 12 Jun 2020
Address #5: 200 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 Jul 2017 to 12 Jun 2020
Address #6: Unit F, 11 Airborne Rd, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Feb 2015 to 03 Jul 2017
Address #7: Unit F, 11 Airborne Rd, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Feb 2015 to 04 Jul 2017
Address #8: Suite 1, Allison Court, 3 Devon Lane, Devonport, Auckland, 0744 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Jul 2014 to 11 Feb 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 02 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Vandenberg, Peter |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
10 Dec 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Barton, David Philip |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
24 Jul 2014 - 12 Dec 2014 |
Director | David Philip Barton |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
24 Jul 2014 - 12 Dec 2014 |
Peter Vandenberg - Director
Appointment date: 10 Dec 2014
Address: Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Jun 2023
Address: Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2021
Address: Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Dec 2014
David Philip Barton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jul 2014
Termination date: 12 Dec 2014
Address: Narrow Neck, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jul 2014
Altus Limited
190 Hurstmere Road
Elite Marine Charters Limited
202 Hurstmere Rd
Kelly Bedford Properties Limited
9/212 Hurstmere Road
The Greek Community And Orthodox Parish Of Auckland And Districts
C/-witten-hannah Howard
Karekare Ratepayers And Residents Trust
Witten-hannah Howard
The Waitakere City Orchestra Trust
Witten-hannah Howard
Freshion Homes Limited
23 Vinewood Drive
Gh Project Management Limited
17 O'neills Avenue
Jaz Domestic Limited
22 Manurere Avenue
Novo Tech Limited
46 Hurstmere Road
Oratia Builders Limited
31 Anzac Street
Projkt-inline Limited
Level 2, 74 Taharoto Road