Battersea Trustees Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 28 Mar 2014. 9429041166024 is the business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Andrew Perrin Maddren - an active director whose contract started on 28 Mar 2014,
Anna Lucia Maddren - an active director whose contract started on 05 Oct 2016,
Terry Owen Nicholas - an inactive director whose contract started on 28 Mar 2014 and was terminated on 05 Oct 2016.
Last updated on 21 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 12 Lynch Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 (types include: physical, registered).
Battersea Trustees Limited had been using Level 1, 63 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland as their registered address until 06 Jan 2017.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous address
Address: Level 1, 63 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 28 Mar 2014 to 06 Jan 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 18 Jan 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Maddren, Anna Lucia |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
07 Oct 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Maddren, Andrew Perrin |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Nicholas, Terry Owen |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2014 - 07 Oct 2016 |
Director | Terry Owen Nicholas |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2014 - 07 Oct 2016 |
Andrew Perrin Maddren - Director
Appointment date: 28 Mar 2014
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2014
Anna Lucia Maddren - Director
Appointment date: 05 Oct 2016
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Oct 2016
Terry Owen Nicholas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Mar 2014
Termination date: 05 Oct 2016
Address: Narrow Neck, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2014
Firstmate Limited
12 Lynch Street
S M E Solutions Limited
12 Lynch Street
Mahurangi Independent Trustees Limited
12 Lynch Street
Sagrada Trustees Limited
10 Lynch Street
Ascot Nominees Limited
10 Lynch Street
Augustus Holdings Limited
10 Lynch Street