Riverhead Resources Limited was started on 11 Mar 2014 and issued a business number of 9429041121641. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Michael Van Hest - an active director whose contract started on 11 Mar 2014,
Graham Alfred Richards - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Mar 2014 and was terminated on 31 Oct 2019.
According to our information (last updated on 30 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (type: registered, physical).
Until 24 Oct 2019, Riverhead Resources Limited had been using 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Van Hest, Michael (a director) located at Rd 1, Kumeu postcode 0891. Riverhead Resources Limited was classified as "Earthmoving services" (business classification E321230).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Dec 2016 to 24 Oct 2019
Address #2: 40 Taharoto Road, Takapuna, North Shore City, 0622 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Mar 2014 to 22 Dec 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 04 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Van Hest, Michael |
Rd 1 Kumeu 0891 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Tahi Property Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030123977 Company Number: 4562379 |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
05 Jun 2015 - 06 Nov 2019 |
Individual | Richards, Graham Alfred |
Waitakere 0660 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2014 - 06 Nov 2019 |
Entity | Tahi Property Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030123977 Company Number: 4562379 |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
05 Jun 2015 - 06 Nov 2019 |
Michael Van Hest - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2014
Address: Rd 1, Kumeu, 0891 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2014
Graham Alfred Richards - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2014
Termination date: 31 Oct 2019
Address: Waitakere, 0660 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2014
Property Channel Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Hr Hydros Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Jsp Trustees Limited
40 Taharoto Road
M.u.g Investments (2012) Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Al1 Investments Limited
40 Taharoto Road
The Heightened Trustees Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Auckland Siteworks (1989) Limited
159 Hurstmere Road
Dubusiness Limited
161 Shakespeare Road
Golden-star Truck Service Co. Limited
4 Napier Avenue
Hydropro Plumbing Gas & Drainage Limited
706 East Coast Road
Tahi Property Trustees Limited
40 Taharoto Road
Westpoint Earthmoving Limited
40 Taharoto Road