Silveroak Private Trust Company Limited was incorporated on 06 Dec 2013 and issued a number of 9429040994567. This registered LTD company has been run by 7 directors: Natalia Ramirez Carrizosa - an active director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2013,
Javier Francisco Ramirez Restrepo - an active director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2013,
Geoffrey Peter Cone - an active director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2013,
Claire Judith Cooke - an active director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2017,
Brent Norman Wicks - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2024.
According to our database (updated on 28 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 17 Jun 2020, Silveroak Private Trust Company Limited had been using Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
New Zealand Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Nov 2014 to 17 Jun 2020
Address: Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jun 2014 to 04 Nov 2014
Address: Level 3, 280 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 19 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | New Zealand Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036803293 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2013 - |
Natalia Ramirez Carrizosa - Director
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2013
Address: Bogota, Colombia
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Javier Francisco Ramirez Restrepo - Director
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2013
Address: Bogota, Colombia
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Geoffrey Peter Cone - Director
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2013
Address: Br Balneario Santa Monica, Loc. La Barra, Maldonado, Uruguay
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Claire Judith Cooke - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2017
Address: Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2017
Brent Norman Wicks - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2024
Address: Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Claudia Shan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2017
Termination date: 19 Feb 2024
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2017
Karen Anne Marshall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2013
Termination date: 01 Apr 2022
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Dec 2019
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2013
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited
Level 6, 59 High Street
Maui Finance Limited
Level 10, 34 Shortland Street
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited
Level 14, 34 Shortland Street
Lzy Trustee Company Limited
Level 1, 2 Princes Street
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited
Level 29, 188 Quay Street
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited
Level 15, 126 Vincent Street