Sports Marine Limited was incorporated on 31 Aug 1978 and issued an NZBN of 9429040360652. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Ian Andrew Williamson - an active director whose contract started on 01 Mar 1990,
Scott Andrew Williamson - an active director whose contract started on 01 Sep 2011,
Peter John Bell - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Feb 1993 and was terminated on 18 Feb 2005.
As stated in our information (updated on 18 Jul 2024), this company filed 1 address: 507 Moorhouse Avenue, Waltham, Christchurch, 8011 (category: office, postal).
Up until 05 Mar 2012, Sports Marine Limited had been using C/-Grant Thornton (Christchurch) Ltd, 9Th Floor Anthony Harper Building, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 100000 shares are issued to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 49000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Williamson, Ian Andrew (an individual) located at Christchurch.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 48 per cent shares (exactly 48000 shares) and includes
Scott Williamson Family Trust - located at Moncks Bay, Christchurch.
The 3rd share allotment (2000 shares, 2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Ian Williamson Family Trust No 2, located at Avonhead, Christchurch (an other). Sports Marine Limited was categorised as "Marine equipment retailing" (ANZSIC G424550).
Principal place of activity
507 Moorhouse Avenue, Waltham, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: C/-grant Thornton (christchurch) Ltd, 9th Floor Anthony Harper Building, 47 Cathedral Square, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Apr 2005 to 05 Mar 2012
Address #2: C/- Ernst & Young Ltd, 6th Floor Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 04 Feb 2003 to 13 Apr 2005
Address #3: R K D Rodgers & Co, 236 Clyde Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 19 Mar 1998 to 04 Feb 2003
Address #4: C/- Ernst & Young, 6th Floor, Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch
Physical address used from 19 Mar 1998 to 04 Feb 2003
Address #5: R K D Rodgers & Co, 236 Clyde Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 19 Mar 1998 to 19 Mar 1998
Address #6: Rkd Rodgers, 1st Floor,broadway Centre Building, 62 Riccarton Rd, Chch
Registered address used from 25 Aug 1997 to 19 Mar 1998
Address #7: Rkd Rodgers, 1st Floor, Broadway Centre Building, 62 Riccarton Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 25 Aug 1997 to 19 Mar 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 02 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49000 | |||
Individual | Williamson, Ian Andrew |
Christchurch |
31 Aug 1978 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 48000 | |||
Other (Other) | Scott Williamson Family Trust |
Moncks Bay Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
03 Apr 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Other (Other) | Ian Williamson Family Trust No 2 |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
27 Jun 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Williamson, Blair James |
Avonhead Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
01 Feb 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Williamson, Adrienne June |
Christchurch |
31 Aug 1978 - 03 Apr 2013 |
Ian Andrew Williamson - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 1990
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 1990
Address: Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Scott Andrew Williamson - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2011
Address: Moncks Bay, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Feb 2020
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Peter John Bell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 1993
Termination date: 18 Feb 2005
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 28 Jan 2003
Rae Line Limited
507 Moorhouse Avenue
Grace Vineyard Music Limited
150 Ferry Road
The Grace Escape
150 Ferry Road
Compassion Trust
150 Ferry Road
Mainland Taxis Limited
160 Ferry Road
Blue Star Taxis Canterbury Limited
160 Ferry Road
Antelope Engineering (n.z.) Limited
54 Mandeville Street
Dockpro Nz Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Marine Flex Limited
335 Lincoln Road
Marine Products (sales Division) Limited
Level 2
Mslb Simulators Limited
85 Corson Avenue
Waimec Group Limited
18 Naseby Street