Balclutha Saleyards Co Limited, a registered company, was launched on 02 Sep 1954. 9429040317649 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been run by 29 directors: Kenneth Gordon Stephens - an active director whose contract began on 13 Sep 1996,
John Charles Duffy - an active director whose contract began on 09 Oct 2015,
Stephen John Korteweg - an active director whose contract began on 11 Sep 2019,
Andrew William Begg - an active director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2020,
Matthew James Allen - an active director whose contract began on 04 Nov 2021.
Last updated on 28 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 (types include: registered, physical).
Balclutha Saleyards Co Limited had been using Shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde St, Balclutha as their registered address up to 14 Mar 2011.
A total of 2800 shares are allotted to 24 shareholders (19 groups). The first group is comprised of 20 shares (0.71%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 20 shares (0.71%). Lastly the third share allocation (20 shares 0.71%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: Shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde St, Balclutha New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Mar 2002 to 14 Mar 2011
Address: C/- Shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Mar 2002 to 14 Mar 2011
Address: Shand Thomson Mactavish & Co, 102-104 Clyde St, Balclutha
Registered address used from 30 Apr 1997 to 25 Mar 2002
Address: C/- Shand Thomson & Co, 102-104 Clyde Street, Balclutha
Physical address used from 30 Apr 1997 to 25 Mar 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2800
Annual return filing month: March
Financial report filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 21 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Director | Korteweg, Stephen John |
Rd 1 Kaitangata 9281 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Individual | Botting, Craig Douglas |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Individual | Willocks, James Robert |
Balclutha 9272 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Lochindorb Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047523524 |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Robinson, Alexander Ayson |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 26 | |||
Director | Begg, Andrew William |
Rd 2 Stirling 9272 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mavora Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038928086 |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Director | Stephens, Kenneth Gordon |
Rd 1 Kaka Point 9271 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #9 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Other (Other) | Telford Farm Training Institute |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 New Zealand |
19 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #10 Number of Shares: 350 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Carrfields Property Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038197109 |
Ashburton 7700 New Zealand |
30 Nov 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #11 Number of Shares: 55 | |||
Individual | Mclay, Coralie Rose |
Rd 2 Owaka 9586 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2020 - |
Individual | Mclay, Gordon John |
Rd 2 Owaka 9586 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #12 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Individual | Inder, David John |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2018 - |
Director | David John Inder |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #13 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Townsend, Ashley Robert |
Rd 2 Balclutha 9272 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2021 - |
Individual | Townsend, Shonelle Jayde |
Rd 2 Balclutha 9272 New Zealand |
17 Feb 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #14 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Cooper, Lindsay Frederick |
Rd 2 Owaka 9586 New Zealand |
02 Mar 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #15 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Bennett, Gregory Robert |
Rd 3 Balclutha 9273 New Zealand |
05 Mar 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #16 Number of Shares: 1050 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Pgg Wrightson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040323497 |
Christchurch Airport Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - |
Shares Allocation #17 Number of Shares: 47 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Hopefield Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040310688 |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - |
Shares Allocation #18 Number of Shares: 54 | |||
Individual | Souness, Alan James |
Rd 4 Balclutha 9274 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2004 - |
Individual | Souness, Russell Craig |
Rd 2 Balclutha 9272 New Zealand |
03 Mar 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #19 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Cubitt, Karen Marie |
Rd 1 Kaka Point 9271 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2018 - |
Individual | Cubitt, Lindsay Robert |
Rd 1 Kaka Point 9271 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Other Small Shareholders |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
15 Aug 2007 - 17 Jul 2024 |
Other | Other Small Shareholders |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
15 Aug 2007 - 17 Jul 2024 |
Entity | West View Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040299693 Company Number: 148471 |
24 Sep 2018 - 12 Mar 2020 | |
Individual | Gordon, Joan Elizabeth |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2008 - 17 Feb 2021 |
Individual | Holgate Dec'd, Morris Errol |
Box 44 Balclutha 9240 New Zealand |
04 Mar 2016 - 09 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Frederick, Cooper Lindsay |
Owaka Owaka 9535 New Zealand |
25 Jan 2018 - 02 Mar 2018 |
Entity | Carrfields Livestock Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036429721 Company Number: 1222113 |
Ashburton 7740 New Zealand |
01 Oct 2013 - 30 Nov 2021 |
Individual | Mclay Dec'd, Lloyd Keith Francis |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - 24 Sep 2018 |
Individual | Mclay, Gordon John |
Rd 1 Balclutha 9271 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2008 - 24 Sep 2018 |
Entity | Carrfields Livestock Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036429721 Company Number: 1222113 |
Ashburton 7740 New Zealand |
01 Oct 2013 - 30 Nov 2021 |
Entity | Sredle New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038959912 Company Number: 554325 |
03 Mar 2004 - 03 Mar 2004 | |
Individual | Gordon, Donald |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - 17 Feb 2021 |
Individual | Burnside, Robert Adam |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2008 - 25 Jan 2018 |
Entity | Wrightson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040840178 Company Number: 30210 |
02 Sep 1954 - 15 Aug 2007 | |
Entity | Sredle New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038959912 Company Number: 554325 |
03 Mar 2004 - 03 Mar 2004 | |
Entity | Grieve Livestock Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039453945 Company Number: 392203 |
03 Mar 2004 - 03 Mar 2004 | |
Entity | Elderstock (si) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036061549 Company Number: 1287144 |
03 Mar 2004 - 01 Oct 2013 | |
Individual | Bennett, Noel |
Tinwald Ashburton 7700 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - 05 Mar 2015 |
Entity | Grieve Livestock Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039453945 Company Number: 392203 |
03 Mar 2004 - 03 Mar 2004 | |
Entity | Wrightson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040840178 Company Number: 30210 |
02 Sep 1954 - 15 Aug 2007 | |
Individual | Holgate, Morris Errol |
East Taieri Mosgiel 9024 New Zealand |
02 Sep 1954 - 04 Mar 2016 |
Entity | West View Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040299693 Company Number: 148471 |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 New Zealand |
24 Sep 2018 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Entity | Elderstock (si) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036061549 Company Number: 1287144 |
03 Mar 2004 - 01 Oct 2013 |
Kenneth Gordon Stephens - Director
Appointment date: 13 Sep 1996
Address: Kaka Point Rd 1, Balclutha, 9271 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2016
Address: Rd 1, Kaka Point, 9271 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2018
John Charles Duffy - Director
Appointment date: 09 Oct 2015
Address: Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Oct 2015
Stephen John Korteweg - Director
Appointment date: 11 Sep 2019
Address: Rd 1, Kaitangata, 9281 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Sep 2019
Andrew William Begg - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2020
Address: Rd 2, Stirling, 9272 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2020
Matthew James Allen - Director
Appointment date: 04 Nov 2021
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Nov 2021
Nathan Alan John Wilson - Director
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2021
Address: Rd 1, Kaka Point, 9271 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2021
Michael James Williams - Director
Appointment date: 15 Dec 2021
Address: Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2021
Ryan William Carr - Director
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2021
Address: Ashburton, 7775 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2021
David John Inder - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2017
Termination date: 20 Dec 2021
Address: Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Dec 2017
Brent Colin Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Apr 2018
Termination date: 02 Nov 2021
Address: Lawrence, Lawrence, 9532 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2018
Christopher Raymond Swale - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2009
Termination date: 29 Oct 2021
Address: Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2011
Address: Rd 2, Mosgiel, 9092 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2018
William Thomas Begg - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Dec 2001
Termination date: 12 Aug 2019
Address: Rd 3, Balclutha, 9273 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2016
Donald Hugh James Baines - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jul 2016
Termination date: 12 Apr 2018
Address: Rd 1, Palmerston North, 4471 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jul 2016
Robert Adam Burnside - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jul 1992
Termination date: 20 Dec 2017
Address: Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2011
William Thomas Bruce Turnham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2006
Termination date: 20 Jul 2016
Address: Rd 5, Rolleston, 7675 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2013
Gerard William Shea - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2011
Termination date: 09 Oct 2015
Address: Lawrence, Lawrence, 9532 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2011
Peter Glendining Grieve - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jul 1992
Termination date: 30 Nov 2011
Address: Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Andrew Kelleher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Dec 2007
Termination date: 17 Mar 2010
Address: 149 Vogel Street, Dunedin,
Address used since 19 Dec 2007
Martin Robert Amos - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Oct 2005
Termination date: 19 Dec 2007
Address: R D 2, Mosgiel,
Address used since 25 Oct 2005
Robin Swanson Gamble - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Oct 1999
Termination date: 20 Dec 2006
Address: Rd 1, Outram,
Address used since 28 Oct 1999
Robert James Fowler - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2001
Termination date: 25 Oct 2005
Address: North Taieri, Mosgiel,
Address used since 04 Mar 2003
James Glenn Mcallister - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2003
Termination date: 25 Oct 2005
Address: Owaka,
Address used since 21 Nov 2003
Alan Charles Eason - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Sep 1993
Termination date: 21 Nov 2003
Address: R D 2, Mosgiel,
Address used since 23 Sep 1993
Keith Mccartney Murdoch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jul 1992
Termination date: 29 Sep 2001
Address: R.d.3, Balclutha,
Address used since 14 Jul 1992
Jeffrey Eric Kerr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 1996
Termination date: 28 Oct 1999
Address: Waverley, Dunedin,
Address used since 03 Dec 1996
Graham Neville Mccambridge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Dec 1992
Termination date: 03 Dec 1996
Address: Balclutha,
Address used since 04 Dec 1992
Joseph Victor Hugh Stephens - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jul 1992
Termination date: 16 Sep 1996
Address: Balclutha,
Address used since 14 Jul 1992
Graham William Bezett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 1992
Termination date: 23 Sep 1993
Address: Allen Road, Green Island,
Address used since 08 Jul 1992
Jeffery Eric Kerr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jul 1992
Termination date: 04 Dec 1992
Address: Waverley, Dunedin,
Address used since 14 Jul 1992
Sanson Farming Co Limited
102 Clyde Street
Tim White Electrical Limited
102 Clyde Street
Glensdale Limited
102 Clyde Street
Clarke Agri Limited
102 Clyde Street
Hewitt Dairy Enterprises Limited
102 Clyde Street
Trk Farm Limited
102 Clyde Street