Westridge Investments Limited, a registered company, was registered on 06 May 1982. 9429040287867 is the number it was issued. "Investment - financial assets" (business classification K624040) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 9 directors: Peter Rae - an active director whose contract started on 24 Jun 1992,
Harry Patrick Rae - an active director whose contract started on 19 Nov 2019,
Paul Simon Denny - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jun 1992 and was terminated on 19 Nov 2019,
Arthur Oliver Turner - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2008 and was terminated on 27 Jun 2013,
Trevor William Johnston - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Jun 1997 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2012.
Last updated on 17 Jul 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 17537, Sumner, Christchurch, 8840 (types include: postal, office).
Westridge Investments Limited had been using Main North Road, Oamaru as their registered address until 03 Dec 2019.
More names used by this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 10 Jul 1989 to 25 Nov 2019 they were named Waitaki Transport Limited, from 06 May 1982 to 10 Jul 1989 they were named Data Processing (North Otago) Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000000 shares) - Peter Rae Industries Limited - located at 8840, Sumner, Christchurch.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Westridge, Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 17 Jul 2020
Principal place of activity
5 Westridge, Scarborough, Christchurch 8081,, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Main North Road, Oamaru New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Jun 1997 to 03 Dec 2019
Address #2: -
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 17 Feb 1992
Address #3: Main North Road, Oamaru New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 03 Dec 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 04 Jul 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Peter Rae Industries Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040308678 |
Sumner Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
06 May 1982 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Waitaki Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038072048 Company Number: 860482 |
Oamaru |
06 May 1982 - 21 Nov 2019 |
Entity | Waitaki Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038072048 Company Number: 860482 |
Oamaru |
06 May 1982 - 21 Nov 2019 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Peter Rae - Director
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1992
Address: Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2015
Harry Patrick Rae - Director
Appointment date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Brunswick, Melbourne, 3056 Australia
Address used since 15 May 2021
Address: North Melbourne, 3051 Australia
Address used since 19 Nov 2019
Paul Simon Denny - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1992
Termination date: 19 Nov 2019
Address: Oamaru, 9401 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2015
Arthur Oliver Turner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2008
Termination date: 27 Jun 2013
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch,
Address used since 16 Dec 2008
Trevor William Johnston - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 1997
Termination date: 30 Sep 2012
Address: Waiareka Junction, Oamaru, 9401 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2010
Raymond John Barry West - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 1997
Termination date: 19 Dec 2008
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch 8041,
Address used since 05 Nov 2008
Rex Allan Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jun 1997
Termination date: 14 Sep 2000
Address: Kurow,
Address used since 26 Jun 1997
Ian Stanley Edmondston - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1992
Termination date: 26 Jun 1997
Address: Incholme, Oamaru,
Address used since 24 Jun 1992
James Daniel Small - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 1992
Termination date: 26 Jun 1997
Address: Gormons Road, Cattle Creek, Otago,
Address used since 24 Jun 1992
Ian Grayson Painting Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Andrew King Consulting Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Pete Mitchell Investments Limited
NZ Limited Company
Blundell Concrete Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Goldsack Builders Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Island Resorts Limited
39 Streamfields Way
Bex Investments Limited
NZ Limited Company
Blooms Cottage Garden Centre Limited
-
Fretwell Investments Limited
-
La Felicita Enterprises (new Zealand) Limited
-
Roux Investment Limited
NZ Limited Company