Holly Bacon Co. Limited, a registered company, was started on 06 Dec 1955. 9429040239002 is the number it was issued. The company has been run by 5 directors: Claire Louise Vogtherr - an active director whose contract began on 17 Sep 1991,
Neil John Pulford - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jul 2002,
Shirley Violet Vogtherr - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Sep 1991 and was terminated on 29 Jul 2002,
Gordon Ernest Vogtherr - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Sep 1991 and was terminated on 29 Jul 2002,
Linda Margaret Bruce - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Sep 1991 and was terminated on 04 May 1998.
Updated on 22 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 (category: registered, service).
Holly Bacon Co. Limited had been using Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings as their physical address up to 29 Oct 2019.
Old names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 06 Dec 1955 to 27 Jan 1994 they were named Hastings Bacon Co Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 62500 shares) - Vogtherr, Claire Louise - located at 4122, Havelock North.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Oct 2016 to 29 Oct 2019
Address #2: Unit 3, Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Feb 2016 to 10 Oct 2016
Address #3: 313 Eastbourne Street West, Hastings New Zealand
Physical address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 05 Feb 2016
Address #4: Bryant Associates, 200w Queen Street, Hastings
Registered address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Address #5: Bryant Associates, I M S Building, 200w Queen Street, Hastings
Physical address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Address #6: 313 Eastbourne Street, Hastings New Zealand
Registered address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 05 Feb 2016
Address #7: -
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 30 Jul 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 62500
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 02 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 62500 | |||
Individual | Vogtherr, Claire Louise |
Havelock North |
06 Dec 1955 - |
Claire Louise Vogtherr - Director
Appointment date: 17 Sep 1991
Address: Rd 2, Hastings, 4172 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Sep 2009
Neil John Pulford - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2002
Address: Rd 2, Hastings, 4172 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Sep 2009
Shirley Violet Vogtherr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Sep 1991
Termination date: 29 Jul 2002
Address: Hastings,
Address used since 17 Sep 1991
Gordon Ernest Vogtherr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Sep 1991
Termination date: 29 Jul 2002
Address: Hastings,
Address used since 17 Sep 1991
Linda Margaret Bruce - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Sep 1991
Termination date: 04 May 1998
Address: Argyle East, Central Hawkes Bay,
Address used since 17 Sep 1991
Antara Group Limited
Business Hq
Centric Group Limited
Business Hq
Hbs Capital Limited
Unit 3, Business Hq
Doll House Properties Limited
Business H Q
The Clifton Reserve Society Incorporated
Moore Stephens Markhams Hawkes Bay Ltd
Anacott Farms Limited Partnership
Moore Stephens Markhams