Howard Wright Limited was started on 26 Sep 1963 and issued an NZ business number of 9429040173436. The registered LTD company has been run by 15 directors: Bruce Norton Moller - an active director whose contract began on 31 Mar 1993,
Wesley Gillanders - an active director whose contract began on 14 Aug 2019,
Clare Adele Thompson - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2020 and was terminated on 16 Jun 2021,
Norton Ross Moller - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2002 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2018,
Richard Frank Wells - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Oct 2007 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2018.
As stated in our database (last updated on 16 Sep 2024), this company registered 1 address: 17 Paraite Road, Bell Block, New Plymouth, 4312 (category: delivery, delivery).
Up until 26 Apr 2017, Howard Wright Limited had been using Pariate Road, Bell Block, New Plymouth as their physical address.
A total of 1594662 shares are allocated to 8 groups (10 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 15333 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mitchell, Graeme Robert (an individual) located at Oakura, Oakura postcode 4314.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.96% shares (exactly 15333 shares) and includes
Batley, Anthony John - located at Rd 4, New Plymouth.
The 3rd share allotment (15333 shares, 0.96%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Moller, Bruce Norton, located at Strandon, New Plymouth (an individual). Howard Wright Limited is categorised as "Medical equipment mfg" (business classification C241230).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 17 Paraite Road, Bell Block, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 04 Apr 2023
Principal place of activity
Paraite Road, Bell Block, New Plymouth, 4341 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Pariate Road, Bell Block, New Plymouth New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Aug 2004 to 26 Apr 2017
Address #2: 9-11 Port View Crescent, New Plymouth
Registered address used from 13 May 1997 to 16 Aug 2004
Address #3: -
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 17 Feb 1992
Address #4: 9 - 11 Port View Crescent, New Plymouth
Physical address used from 17 Feb 1992 to 16 Aug 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1594662
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 01 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 15333 | |||
Individual | Mitchell, Graeme Robert |
Oakura Oakura 4314 New Zealand |
17 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 15333 | |||
Individual | Batley, Anthony John |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 New Zealand |
17 Nov 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 15333 | |||
Individual | Moller, Bruce Norton |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
26 Sep 1963 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 15333 | |||
Individual | Jones, Greg Trevor |
Whalers Gate New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
13 Dec 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 323438 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Norton Consolidated Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040175003 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
26 Sep 1963 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 826562 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | B & H Moller Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041137543 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
11 Nov 2014 - |
Individual | Moller, Helen Ruth |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
26 Sep 1963 - |
Individual | Moller, Bruce Norton |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
26 Sep 1963 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 306663 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Moller Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039849472 |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
25 Mar 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 76667 | |||
Other (Other) | Sl Joyce Trust |
Rd 2 Dairy Flat 0792 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Staples Rodway Taranaki Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035677123 Company Number: 1441582 |
New Plymouth New Zealand |
03 Aug 2010 - 04 Feb 2019 |
Entity | Joyce Advisory Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037529291 Company Number: 970011 |
25 Mar 2004 - 03 Aug 2010 | |
Entity | Staples Rodway Taranaki Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035677123 Company Number: 1441582 |
New Plymouth New Zealand |
03 Aug 2010 - 04 Feb 2019 |
Individual | Mazengarb, Allen Stuart |
New Plymouth |
26 Sep 1963 - 11 Nov 2014 |
Entity | Joyce Advisory Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037529291 Company Number: 970011 |
25 Mar 2004 - 03 Aug 2010 | |
Individual | Jannings, Peter Howard |
New Plymouth |
25 Mar 2004 - 25 Mar 2004 |
Entity | Joyce Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037529291 Company Number: 970011 |
25 Mar 2004 - 03 Aug 2010 | |
Individual | Jannings, Gaylene Ruth |
New Plymouth |
25 Mar 2004 - 25 Mar 2004 |
Entity | Joyce Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037529291 Company Number: 970011 |
25 Mar 2004 - 03 Aug 2010 |
Bruce Norton Moller - Director
Appointment date: 31 Mar 1993
Address: Strandon, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2013
Wesley Gillanders - Director
Appointment date: 14 Aug 2019
Address: Rd 7, Norfolk, 4387 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Aug 2019
Clare Adele Thompson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2020
Termination date: 16 Jun 2021
Address: Pelican Waters Qld, 4551 Australia
Address used since 15 Apr 2020
Norton Ross Moller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2002
Termination date: 31 Mar 2018
Address: Oakura, 4314 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2016
Richard Frank Wells - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2007
Termination date: 31 Mar 2018
Address: Days Bay, Eastbourne, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2016
John Moller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2011
Termination date: 31 Mar 2018
Address: #12-06 Parc Seabreeze, Singapore, 427711 Singapore
Address used since 01 Jan 2014
Ross Earle Moller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Nov 2002
Termination date: 21 Oct 2016
Address: 7 Orange Grove Road, Singapore, 258355 Singapore
Address used since 01 Jan 2014
Steven Leonard Joyce - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 2001
Termination date: 28 Nov 2008
Address: Rd 2, Albany 1311,
Address used since 03 Aug 2005
Peter Howard Jannings - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Aug 2000
Termination date: 26 Apr 2002
Address: New Plymouth,
Address used since 14 Aug 2000
Norton Ross Moller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jan 1997
Termination date: 04 Apr 2002
Address: Jans Terrace, Oakura,
Address used since 06 Jan 1997
Gaylene Ruth Jannings - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Jan 1997
Termination date: 14 Aug 2000
Address: New Plymouth,
Address used since 06 Jan 1997
Barry Raymond Upson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 1993
Termination date: 31 Mar 1998
Address: Inglewood,
Address used since 09 Nov 1993
Dean Howard Wright - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 1987
Termination date: 06 Jan 1997
Address: Oakura,
Address used since 12 Oct 1987
Bruce Carlaw Richards - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 1993
Termination date: 06 Jan 1997
Address: New Plymouth,
Address used since 09 Nov 1993
Stanley Wright Howard - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Oct 1987
Termination date: 09 Nov 1993
Address: New Plymouth,
Address used since 13 Oct 1987
Howard Wright Pacific Limited
Paraite Road
Nexans New Zealand Limited
69 Paraite Road
Mckechnie Aluminium Solutions Limited
Paraite Road
Omega Window Systems Limited
36 Paraite Road
Nzec Manaia Limited
14 Connett Road, Bell Block
Nzec Tariki Limited
14 Connett Road, Bell Block
Eclipse Skin Technology Limited
11 Thackeray Street
Global Joint Solutions Limited
47 Messenger Terrace
Laser And Scopes Limited
152 Pencarrow Road
Medisave Australasia Limited
166 Bollard Road
Phec Enterprises Limited
49 Hendersons Road
Vand Medical Limited
33 Montgomery Road