Realty Holdings Limited, a registered company, was started on 01 Sep 1958. 9429040134659 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is how the company is categorised. This company has been run by 3 directors: Nigel Ambrose Bennetts - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 1958,
Kenneth Ambrose Bennetts - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Sep 1958 and was terminated on 24 Aug 2014,
Diana Marjorie Edith Bennetts - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Aug 1993 and was terminated on 24 Aug 2014.
Updated on 29 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 20 Henley Road, Rd 1, Kaukapakapa, 0871 (types include: physical, registered).
Realty Holdings Limited had been using 4A 173 Hurstmere Rd, Takapuna as their physical address up to 29 Sep 2014.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Bennetts, Nigel Ambrose - located at 0871, Kaukapakapa, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
20 Henley Road, Rd 1, Kaukapakapa, 0871 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 4a 173 Hurstmere Rd, Takapuna New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Oct 2005 to 29 Sep 2014
Address: 4a 173 Hurtsmere Rd, Takapuna New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Oct 2005 to 29 Sep 2014
Address: 69 Exmouth Road, Northcote, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 22 Oct 2005
Address: C/o M/s De Latour & Toomath, 30 Teasdale St, Te Awamutu
Registered address used from 07 Dec 1995 to 22 Oct 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Bennetts, Nigel Ambrose |
Kaukapakapa Auckland New Zealand |
01 Sep 1958 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bennetts, Kenneth Ambrose |
Takapuna Auckland New Zealand |
01 Sep 1958 - 20 Sep 2014 |
Individual | Bennetts, Diana Marjorie Edith |
Takapuna New Zealand |
01 Sep 1958 - 20 Sep 2014 |
Nigel Ambrose Bennetts - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 1958
Address: Kaukapakapa, Auckland, 0871 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2004
Kenneth Ambrose Bennetts - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 1958
Termination date: 24 Aug 2014
Address: Takapuna, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Oct 2005
Diana Marjorie Edith Bennetts - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Aug 1993
Termination date: 24 Aug 2014
Address: Takapuna, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Oct 2005
Kaukapakapa Pony Club Incorporated
Henley Road
Sort My Books Limited
7 Michelia Lane
Maccur Properties Limited
10 Michelia Lane
Oberon Limited
754 Kaipara Coast Highway
Healthy Water Products Nz Limited
754 Kaipara Coast Highway
Kotare Forge Limited
799 Kaipara Coast Highway
Barrabel Baye Properties Limited
130 Pinchgut Road
Jenter Limited
64 Sharon Rd
Maccur Properties Limited
10 Michelia Lane
Peak Falls Limited
649 Peak Road
Reinga Holdings Limited
29 Pinchgut Road
Zakura Limited
230 Oyster Point Rd