Ganda Chhiba Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 21 Sep 1983. 9429039990914 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been run by 5 directors: Nikesh Krishna Ganda - an active director whose contract started on 29 Nov 2010,
Ishwar Ganda - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Mar 2011 and was terminated on 25 Mar 2012,
Ishwar Ganda - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Oct 1991 and was terminated on 30 Nov 2010,
Bharat Ganda - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Oct 1991 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2003,
Dayaram Ganda - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Oct 1991 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2003.
Updated on 25 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 39 Ishwar Ganda Boulevard, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 (type: registered, physical).
Ganda Chhiba Limited had been using 19 Marquess Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch as their registered address up to 07 Mar 2018.
More names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 21 Sep 1983 to 22 Oct 1991 they were named C Robertson & Company Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 2000 shares) - Ganda, Nikesh Krishna - located at 8025, Halswell, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
39 Ishwar Ganda Boulevard, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 19 Marquess Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Mar 2015 to 07 Mar 2018
Address: 19 Marquess Avenue, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Sep 2014 to 05 Sep 2014
Address: 76 Patterson Terrace, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Feb 2012 to 05 Sep 2014
Address: 76 Patterson Terrace, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Feb 2012 to 06 Mar 2015
Address: 76 Patterson Terrace, Halswell, Christchurch 8025 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Dec 2007 to 10 Feb 2012
Address: 76 Patterson Tce, Halswell, Christchurch 8025 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Dec 2007 to 10 Feb 2012
Address: 76 Patterson Terrace, Halswell, Christchurch 8003
Physical address used from 01 Aug 2003 to 20 Dec 2007
Address: 222 Main South Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 05 Jan 2001 to 05 Jan 2001
Address: 76 Patterson Terrace, Halswell, Christchurch 8003
Physical address used from 05 Jan 2001 to 05 Jan 2001
Address: 132 Hackthorne Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 05 Jan 2001 to 01 Aug 2003
Address: 222 Main South Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 05 Jan 2001 to 20 Dec 2007
Address: C/o Stowell & Vile, 221 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 03 May 1993 to 05 Jan 2001
Address: -
Physical address used from 18 Feb 1992 to 05 Jan 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 22 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Individual | Ganda, Nikesh Krishna |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
21 Sep 1983 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ganda, Vasanti |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
21 Sep 1983 - 18 Feb 2019 |
Individual | Ganda, Ishwar |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
21 Sep 1983 - 19 May 2012 |
Nikesh Krishna Ganda - Director
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2010
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2014
Ishwar Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Mar 2011
Termination date: 25 Mar 2012
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2011
Ishwar Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Oct 1991
Termination date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Halswell, Christchurch 8025, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2007
Bharat Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Oct 1991
Termination date: 31 Jul 2003
Address: Greymouth,
Address used since 04 Oct 1991
Dayaram Ganda - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Oct 1991
Termination date: 31 Jul 2003
Address: Greymouth,
Address used since 04 Oct 1991
Assen Education & Culture Limited
77 Whincops Road
Assen International Limited
77 Whincops Road
Knightware Holdings Limited
48 Whincops Road
Brainways Limited
76 Whincops Road
Lend The Label Limited
3 Bamber Crescent
Byod Limited
48 Bradwell Crescent