Jones Lang Lasalle Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 Dec 1983. 9429039984456 is the number it was issued. The company has been run by 9 directors: Todd Donald Lauchlan - an active director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2018,
Marcelino Apolles - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2022,
Lance Diedericks - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Jul 2020 and was terminated on 20 Jan 2022,
Mark Stephen Grant - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Dec 2014 and was terminated on 29 Jun 2018,
Nicholas Robert Hargreaves - an inactive director whose contract started on 17 Feb 2006 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2018.
Updated on 03 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 16, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 (category: physical, service).
Jones Lang Lasalle Limited had been using Level 16, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland as their registered address up to 28 Sep 2020.
Previous names for the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 14 Feb 1986 to 12 Mar 1999 they were named Jones Lang Wootton Limited, from 13 Dec 1983 to 14 Feb 1986 they were named Delta Realty Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 50000 shares) - Jones Lang Lasalle Holdings Limited - located at 1010, 188 Quay Street, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 16, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2002 to 28 Sep 2020
Address: Level 23, 135 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 01 Dec 2001 to 17 May 2002
Address: Level 8, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Dec 2001 to 17 May 2002
Address: Jones Lang Lasalle Ltd, Level 23, A S B, Bank Centre, 135 Albert Str, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Dec 2001 to 01 Dec 2001
Address: Jones La Sallw Ltd, Level 23, A S B Bank, Centre, 135 Albert Str, Auckland
Physical address used from 06 Sep 2000 to 01 Dec 2001
Address: Jones Lang Wooton, Level 23, A S B Bank, Centre, 135 Albert Str, Auckland
Physical address used from 18 Jun 1997 to 06 Sep 2000
Address: Ground Fl, 52 Shortland St, Auckland
Registered address used from 19 Jan 1996 to 01 Dec 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: August
Financial report filing month: December
Annual return last filed: 21 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 50000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Jones Lang Lasalle Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039778963 |
188 Quay Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
13 Dec 1983 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Todd Donald Lauchlan - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2018
Address: Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2018
Marcelino Apolles - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2022
Address: Orakei, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2022
Lance Diedericks - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jul 2020
Termination date: 20 Jan 2022
Address: Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2020
Mark Stephen Grant - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2014
Termination date: 29 Jun 2018
Address: Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2016
Nicholas Robert Hargreaves - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Feb 2006
Termination date: 01 Mar 2018
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2016
Heath Evan Young - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2010
Termination date: 06 Aug 2015
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2010
John Patrick Dunn - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Oct 1985
Termination date: 28 Feb 2006
Address: Mairangi Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Oct 1985
Peter John Coman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Sep 2003
Termination date: 25 Mar 2004
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Sep 2003
Donald Harrington - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Apr 1995
Termination date: 09 Sep 2003
Address: Greenlane, Auckland,
Address used since 06 Apr 1995
Neuren Trustee Limited
Lowndes Jordan, Level 15 Pwc Tower
Industrial And Commercial Bank Of China (new Zealand) Limited
Level 11
Klouwens Trustee Limited
Level 20
Vernon Quoi Trustee Company Limited
Level 20
Newbranch Limited
188 Quay Street