Frontier Investments Limited was started on 15 Feb 1985 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039870513. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 5 directors: Richard John Giltrap - an active director whose contract began on 29 May 2014,
Michael James Giltrap - an active director whose contract began on 29 May 2014,
Colin John Giltrap - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 May 1989 and was terminated on 17 Apr 2024,
Derek Malcolm Mckinstry - an inactive director whose contract began on 22 Oct 1992 and was terminated on 15 Jun 2016,
Geoffrey John Burnard Drew - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 May 1989 and was terminated on 29 May 2014.
According to our data (updated on 30 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: Level 2, 119 Great North Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 10 Oct 2017, Frontier Investments Limited had been using Level 6, 2 Burns Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Giltrap, Richard John (a director) located at Herne Bay, Auckland postcode 1011.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Giltrap, Michael James - located at Herne Bay, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 6, 2 Burns Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Sep 2014 to 10 Oct 2017
Address: Level 1, 6 Hill Street, Hamilton New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Mar 2003 to 05 Sep 2014
Address: Level 1, Drew Flyger House, Cnr King Street & Seddon Road, Hamilton
Registered address used from 31 Jul 1998 to 07 Mar 2003
Address: Level 1, Drew Bullen House, Cnr King Street & Seddon Road, Hamilton
Physical address used from 31 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
Address: Level 1, Dreww Flyger House, Cnr King Street & Seddon Road, Hamilton
Physical address used from 07 Aug 1997 to 31 Jul 1998
Address: Minolta House,, Cnr Princes & Harwood Streets,, Hamilton.
Registered address used from 20 May 1996 to 31 Jul 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 23 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Giltrap, Richard John |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
02 May 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Giltrap, Michael James |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
02 May 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Giltrap, Colin John |
89 Halsey Street Auckland New Zealand |
15 Feb 1985 - 02 May 2023 |
Individual | Drew, Geoffrey John Burnard |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
15 Feb 1985 - 05 Jun 2014 |
Richard John Giltrap - Director
Appointment date: 29 May 2014
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Mar 2017
Michael James Giltrap - Director
Appointment date: 29 May 2014
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2014
Colin John Giltrap - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 May 1989
Termination date: 17 Apr 2024
Address: 89 Halsey Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2015
Derek Malcolm Mckinstry - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Oct 1992
Termination date: 15 Jun 2016
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Dec 2008
Geoffrey John Burnard Drew - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 May 1989
Termination date: 29 May 2014
Address: Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 16 May 1989
Hydroflow Distributors Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road
Baumatic Appliances Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road
Irontide Marine Contracting Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road
Construction Project Management Consultancy Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road
Streets Ahead Property Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road
Jones Family Investments Limited
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road