Concrete Structures (Nz) Limited, a registered company, was launched on 28 Jan 1986. 9429039822260 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been run by 1 director, named Michael John Romanes - an active director whose contract started on 24 Aug 1989.
Last updated on 24 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: P O Box 849, Rotorua, 3040 (category: postal, office).
Concrete Structures (Nz) Limited had been using Same As Registered Office Address as their physical address up to 21 Mar 2002.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 2000 shares) - Mikro Holdings Limited - located at 3040, Rotorua.
Principal place of activity
143 Riri Street, Rotorua, Bay Of Plenty, 3015 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Same As Registered Office Address
Physical address used from 03 May 2001 to 21 Mar 2002
Address #2: 104 Tallyho Street, Rotorua
Registered address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 21 Mar 2002
Address #3: -
Physical address used from 19 Feb 1992 to 03 May 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 12 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mikro Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040200569 |
Rotorua |
28 Jan 1986 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Romanes, Paul |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - 06 Feb 2019 |
Entity | 1108 Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031814058 Company Number: 2349389 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2017 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Entity | 1108 Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031814058 Company Number: 2349389 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2017 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Entity | 1108 Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031814058 Company Number: 2349389 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2017 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Individual | Romanes, Paul |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - 06 Feb 2019 |
Entity | 1108 Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031814058 Company Number: 2349389 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2017 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Entity | 1108 Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031814058 Company Number: 2349389 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2017 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Individual | Romanes, Paul |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - 06 Feb 2019 |
Individual | Romanes, Paul |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
12 Apr 2016 - 06 Feb 2019 |
Michael John Romanes - Director
Appointment date: 24 Aug 1989
Address: R D 5, Rotorua, 3076 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Feb 2024
Address: R D 5, Rotorua, 3076 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2016
Concrete Structures (cook Islands) Limited
143 Riri Street
The Blue Baths Limited
143 Riri Street
Mikro Holdings Limited
143 Riri Street
Noremac 2017 Limited
139 Riri Street
Rotorua Musical Theatre Incorporated
Casa Blanca Theatre
Hayes International
170 - 190 Riri Street