Graeme Robb Design Limited was registered on 03 Oct 1986 and issued an NZBN of 9429039705938. The removed LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Graeme Charles Robb - an active director whose contract began on 10 Oct 1986,
Michelle Marie Robb - an active director whose contract began on 10 Oct 1986.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 19 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 85 Picton Avenue, Christchurch (category: physical, registered).
Until 28 Oct 2004, Graeme Robb Design Limited had been using 35 Matai Street, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address.
BizDb found other names used by the company: from 03 Oct 1986 to 13 Apr 1994 they were called Hallmark Builders (1986) Limited.
A total of 5000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 3000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Robb, Graeme Charles (an individual) located at Christchurch.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 40 per cent shares (exactly 2000 shares) and includes
Robb, Michelle Marie - located at Christchurch.
Previous addresses
Address: 35 Matai Street, Riccarton, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 08 Aug 2003 to 28 Oct 2004
Address: 5th Floor, 7 Liverpool Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 08 Aug 2003
Address: -
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Jul 1997
Address: C/- Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, Cnr Worcester Street & Oxford Terrace, Christchurch
Registered address used from 31 Aug 1993 to 08 Aug 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 21 Jun 2021
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 3000 | |||
Individual | Robb, Graeme Charles |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 Oct 1986 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Individual | Robb, Michelle Marie |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 Oct 1986 - |
Graeme Charles Robb - Director
Appointment date: 10 Oct 1986
Address: Christchurch, Christchurch, New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2015
Michelle Marie Robb - Director
Appointment date: 10 Oct 1986
Address: Christchurch, Christchurch, New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2015
G D Gardener Builders Limited
85 Picton Avenue, Riccarton
Triumph One Limited
85 Picton Avenue, Riccarton
Cafe 39 On Tancred Limited
85 Picton Avenue
The Up Beet Company Limited
85 Picton Avenue
Anderson Livestock Limited
85 Picton Avenue
Noel J Marine Limited
85 Picton Ave