Counties Manukau Roofing Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 Apr 1988. 9429039465429 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: John Ross Rose - an active director whose contract began on 26 Jul 1989,
Lynley Anne Rose - an inactive director whose contract began on 26 Jul 1989 and was terminated on 19 May 2020.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 11 Adams Drive, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: registered, physical).
Counties Manukau Roofing Limited had been using 1St Floor, Asb Bank Great South Road, Manurewa, Auckland as their registered address up to 28 Jul 1998.
More names used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 06 Nov 1991 to 12 Mar 2003 they were called J R Rose Roofing Limited, from 23 Nov 1988 to 06 Nov 1991 they were called John Ross Rose Builders Limited and from 14 Apr 1988 to 23 Nov 1988 they were called Coaxal Management Services (20) Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 500 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 1st Floor, Asb Bank Great South Road, Manurewa, Auckland
Registered address used from 28 Jul 1998 to 28 Jul 1998
Address: Butcher Road, R.d.1, Pukekohe New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 28 Jul 1998 to 05 Dec 2016
Address: Loudon Hough, Asb Building, 1st Floor, Great South Road, Manurewa
Physical address used from 28 Jul 1998 to 28 Jul 1998
Address: 236a Great South Road, Manurewa
Registered address used from 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Jul 1998
Address: 12th Floor, Downtown House, 21-29 Queen Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 04 Sep 1992 to 01 Jul 1994
Address: -
Physical address used from 20 Feb 1992 to 28 Jul 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 29 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Rose, Lynley Anne |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 New Zealand |
14 Apr 1988 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Rose, John Ross |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 New Zealand |
14 Apr 1988 - |
John Ross Rose - Director
Appointment date: 26 Jul 1989
Address: Rd 1, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2016
Lynley Anne Rose - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Jul 1989
Termination date: 19 May 2020
Address: Rd 1, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2016
Pukekohe Batteries & Radiators (2008) Limited
23 Adams Drive
Bowline Charters Limited
40 Adams Drive
Greatgoods Limited
44 Adams Drive
Genesis Hire Limited
Unit 1, 71 Adams Drive
Trackworks Machinery Limited
Unit 1, 71 Adams Drive
Cleven Electrical Limited
69 Adams Road