Auckland Photographic Supplies Limited, a registered company, was registered on 05 Jul 1988. 9429039460592 is the number it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Stephen Michael Edwards - an active director whose contract started on 17 May 1989,
Kelvin John Glover - an inactive director whose contract started on 09 Dec 1992 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2017.
Updated on 19 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 175 Great North Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: physical, registered).
Auckland Photographic Supplies Limited had been using Deloitte Touche Tohmatsu, 13Th Floor, Tower 2, Shortland Centre, Auckland as their registered address up until 02 Sep 1998.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 8000 shares (80%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 2000 shares (20%).
Previous addresses
Address: Deloitte Touche Tohmatsu, 13th Floor, Tower 2, Shortland Centre, Auckland
Registered address used from 02 Sep 1998 to 02 Sep 1998
Address: 175 Great North Road, Ponsonby, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Sep 1998 to 17 Sep 2012
Address: Cnr Stanley Street & Alten Road, Parnell, Auckland
Physical address used from 21 Nov 1997 to 21 Nov 1997
Address: 175 Great North Road, Ponosnby, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Nov 1997 to 21 Nov 1997
Address: 65 Beachhaven Road, Beachhaven, Auckland 10
Registered address used from 22 Dec 1993 to 02 Sep 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 19 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 8000 | |||
Individual | Edwards, Stephen Michael |
St Heliers Auckland |
05 Jul 1988 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2000 | |||
Individual | Edwards, Toni Maree |
St Heliers Auckland |
05 Jul 1988 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Glover, Robyn Grace |
Rothesay Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
05 Jul 1988 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Individual | Glover, Kelvin John |
Rothesay Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
05 Jul 1988 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Stephen Michael Edwards - Director
Appointment date: 17 May 1989
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 17 May 1989
Kelvin John Glover - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Dec 1992
Termination date: 31 Mar 2017
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2012
Tea Leaf Trustee Limited
3/171 Great North Road
Prisoners Action Trust
159 Great North Road
Digilowcost (asia Pacific) Limited
196 Great North Road
C Chung Investments Limited
3 Sussex Street
Tk Global Network Limited
3 Sussex Street
Friends Of The Earth New Zealand Limited
147 Great North Road