Procall Limited was registered on 12 Apr 1989 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039336576. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Bruce Craig Jeffrey - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2005,
Jason George Osborn - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Apr 1989 and was terminated on 24 Aug 2017,
Jacqueline Mary Osborn - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 Apr 1989 and was terminated on 10 Jul 2000.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 10 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 88A Patteson Avenue, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 (types include: registered, physical).
Up until 22 May 2020, Procall Limited had been using 25 Walls Road, Penrose as their physical address.
BizDb identified previous names for the company: from 11 Apr 2021 to 07 Jun 2021 they were named Aircall Limited, from 19 Aug 2020 to 11 Apr 2021 they were named Network Specialists Limited and from 12 Apr 1989 to 19 Aug 2020 they were named Jac Jay Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Jeffrey, Bruce Craig (an individual) located at Mission Bay, Auckland postcode 1071. Procall Limited has been classified as "Internet service provider" (business classification J591020).
Principal place of activity
88a Patteson Ave, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 25 Walls Road, Penrose New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 May 2008 to 22 May 2020
Address: 25 Walls Rd, Penrose New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 May 2008 to 22 May 2020
Address: 21 Walls Road, Penrose
Physical address used from 24 Nov 2004 to 21 May 2008
Address: 21 Walls Road, Penrose, Auckland
Physical address used from 07 Nov 2001 to 07 Nov 2001
Address: Mgi Wilson Eliott Ltd, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland
Physical address used from 07 Nov 2001 to 24 Nov 2004
Address: 2/101 Reihana Street, Orakei, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Jul 1996 to 21 May 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 02 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Jeffrey, Bruce Craig |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
11 May 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Osborn, Jacqueline Mary |
St Heliers Auckland |
18 May 2004 - 24 Aug 2017 |
Individual | Osborn, Jason George |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
18 May 2004 - 24 Aug 2017 |
Entity | Pidgeon Judd Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033844534 Company Number: 1870297 |
09 Aug 2007 - 24 Aug 2017 | |
Entity | Stewartco Trust Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037626655 Company Number: 951958 |
12 Apr 1989 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | Pidgeon Judd Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033844534 Company Number: 1870297 |
09 Aug 2007 - 24 Aug 2017 | |
Entity | The Clumber Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033844534 Company Number: 1870297 |
09 Aug 2007 - 24 Aug 2017 | |
Entity | The Clumber Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033844534 Company Number: 1870297 |
09 Aug 2007 - 24 Aug 2017 | |
Individual | Avery, John Richard |
Milford Auckland |
12 Apr 1989 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Entity | Stewartco Trust Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037626655 Company Number: 951958 |
12 Apr 1989 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bruce Craig Jeffrey - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2005
Address: Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2019
Address: Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2010
Jason George Osborn - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Apr 1989
Termination date: 24 Aug 2017
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2010
Jacqueline Mary Osborn - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Apr 1989
Termination date: 10 Jul 2000
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland,
Address used since 12 Apr 1989
5c Bassant Limited
5c Bassant Avenue
Jr Webb & Son (1932) Limited
5c Bassant Avenue
Bracey Electrical Limited
1 Bassant Ave
Blackhawk Tracking Systems Limited
12 Walls Road
Akino Property Investments Limited
12 Walls Road
12 Walls Road Limited
12 Walls Road
Connectplay Limited
16a Aliford Avenue
Devoli Limited
1/14 Penrose Road
Enzo Consulting New Zealand Pty Limited
710 Great South Road
Flip Services Limited
Level 4, 110 Symonds Street
Oneorigin New Zealand Limited
Suit 4, 37 Wilkinson Road
Telnet Telecommunication Limited
101b Station Road, Penrose