Mayall Properties Limited, a registered company, was registered on 15 Mar 1990. 9429039235039 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Warren Arthur Mayall - an active director whose contract started on 15 Mar 1990,
Linda May Mayall - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Jul 1999 and was terminated on 21 Jun 2013,
Mark Bain Hatwell - an inactive director whose contract started on 15 Mar 1990 and was terminated on 26 Jun 1995.
Updated on 09 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 275 Hukanui Road, Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210 (category: physical, registered).
Mayall Properties Limited had been using C/-Ancellclare, Chartered Accountants, Cnr Somerset Street & Devon Road, Hamilton as their registered address up until 30 Jan 2009.
Other names for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 15 Mar 1990 to 15 Aug 1995 they were called Mayall Hatwell Properties Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 1 share (0.01%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.01%). Lastly the next share allotment (9998 shares 99.98%) made up of 2 entities.
Previous addresses
Address: C/-ancellclare, Chartered Accountants, Cnr Somerset Street & Devon Road, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 28 May 2005 to 30 Jan 2009
Address: Pembroke House, Cnr Pembroke & Clarence Streets, Hamilton
Physical address used from 24 May 2001 to 24 May 2001
Address: Cnr Somerset Street, Devon Road, Hamilton
Physical address used from 24 May 2001 to 28 May 2005
Address: 'pembroke House', Cnr Pembroke & Clarence Streets, Hamilton
Registered address used from 24 May 2001 to 28 May 2005
Address: 'pembroke House', Cnr Pembroke & Clarence Streets, Box 534, Hamilton
Registered address used from 26 Jun 1997 to 24 May 2001
Address: 'pembroke House', Cnr Pembroke & Clarence Streets, Hamilton
Registered address used from 26 May 1994 to 26 Jun 1997
Address: C/- Ancell Clare & Co,, Pembroke House,, 25 Pembroke House,, Hamilton.
Registered address used from 25 May 1994 to 26 May 1994
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 01 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Mayall, Warren Arthur |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
13 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Mayall, Linda May |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
13 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 9998 | |||
Individual | Mayall, Linda May |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
13 May 2004 - |
Individual | Mayall, Warren Arthur |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
13 May 2004 - |
Warren Arthur Mayall - Director
Appointment date: 15 Mar 1990
Address: Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2023
Address: Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 21 May 2010
Linda May Mayall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jul 1999
Termination date: 21 Jun 2013
Address: Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 21 May 2010
Mark Bain Hatwell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Mar 1990
Termination date: 26 Jun 1995
Address: Hamilton,
Address used since 15 Mar 1990
Ancellclare Chartered Accountants Limited
275 Hukanui Road
Murdoch Residential Limited
275 Hukanui Road
Bell Trust Holdings Limited
275 Hukanui Road
Mkh Investments Limited
275 Hukanui Road
Faye Bowring Investments Limited
275 Hukanui Road
Geometria Limited
275 Hukanui Road