Mi Ex Limited was incorporated on 25 Nov 1991 and issued an NZBN of 9429039043092. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Nyomi Aileen Shaw - an active director whose contract began on 14 Aug 2020,
Andrew John Davidson - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Nov 1991 and was terminated on 14 Aug 2020,
Judith Mary Davidson - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Nov 1991 and was terminated on 12 Feb 2010.
According to our information (updated on 09 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 57A Theodosia Street, Timaru, 7940 (types include: physical, service).
Up until 12 May 2022, Mi Ex Limited had been using 57A Theodosia Street, Timaru as their physical address.
BizDb found previous aliases for this company: from 25 Nov 1991 to 08 Apr 2021 they were called Mini Excavations Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Davidson, Andrew John (an individual) located at Gleniti, Timaru postcode 7910.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 57a Theodosia Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Feb 2009 to 12 May 2022
Address #2: 57a Theodosia Street, Timaru
Registered & physical address used from 13 Mar 2002 to 24 Feb 2009
Address #3: C/- Dockrill Mitchell Mccleary, 57a Theodosia Street, Timaru
Registered address used from 02 Feb 2002 to 13 Mar 2002
Address #4: Bishop Dockrill Mccleary, 171 Stafford Street, Timaru
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 13 Mar 2002
Address #5: Bishop Dockrill Mccleary, 171 Stafford Street, Timaru
Registered address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Feb 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 24 Feb 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Davidson, Andrew John |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
25 Nov 1991 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Davidson, Judith Mary |
Temuka |
25 Nov 1991 - 11 May 2012 |
Nyomi Aileen Shaw - Director
Appointment date: 14 Aug 2020
Address: Gleniti, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Aug 2020
Andrew John Davidson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 1991
Termination date: 14 Aug 2020
Address: Gleniti, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2018
Address: Temuka, 7986 New Zealand
Address used since 11 May 2012
Judith Mary Davidson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 1991
Termination date: 12 Feb 2010
Address: Temuka, 7920 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Feb 2010
Klifden Limited
57a Theodosia Street
Yonder.co.nz Limited
57a Theodosia Street
G.b. Timaru Limited
57a Theodosia Street
Aerialtech Limited
57a Theodosia Street
South Canterbury Morris Minor Club Incorporated
57a Theodosia Street
South Canterbury Mountain Bike Club Incorporated
C/o Mitchell Mccleary